blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1314989

EP1314989 - Electronic test system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.10.2009
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Agilent Technologies, Inc.
- a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard
Santa Clara CA 95051 / US
[N/P]
Former [2007/04]For all designated states
Agilent Technologies, Inc.
- a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US
Former [2003/22]For all designated states
Agilent Technologies, Inc.
395 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Sutton, Christopher K.
5027 Dover Street
Everett, WA 98203 / US
02 / Pritchard, William R.
4430 126th Place
NE Marysville, WA 98271 / US
03 / Carlson, Kirsten C.
109 Stone Ridge
Dr. Snohomish, WA 98290 / US
04 / Martin, James
11403 48th Drive NE
Marysville, WA 98271 / US
 [2003/22]
Representative(s)Jehan, Robert, et al
Williams Powell
44 Prospect Place
Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/22]Jehan, Robert, et al
Williams Powell Morley House 26-30 Holborn Viaduct
London EC1A 2BP / GB
Application number, filing date02257779.511.11.2002
[2003/22]
Priority number, dateUS2001099222419.11.2001         Original published format: US 992224
[2003/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1314989
Date:28.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1314989
Date:17.03.2004
[2004/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.2004
ClassificationIPC:G01R31/28, G01R19/25
[2003/22]
CPC:
G06F11/263 (EP,US); G06F11/22 (KR); G01R31/28 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/50]
Former [2003/22]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und elektronische Vorrichtung zum Testen[2003/22]
English:Electronic test system and method[2003/22]
French:Procédé et système électronique de test[2003/22]
Examination procedure05.04.2004Examination requested  [2004/24]
19.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.06.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/48]
07.07.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2009/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
29.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
27.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
27.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200807   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US5206582  (EKSTEDT THOMAS W [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * figure 4 * * column 2, line 5 - line 65 * * column 12, line 32 - line 60 *;
 [X]WO9947937  (TERADYNE INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 7, line 20 - page 10, line 12 *;
 [E]EP1308737  (AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [E] 1-10 * figure 2 * * column 7, line 11 - column 8, line 18 *;
 [X]  - M.KLINGER, "REUSABLE TEST EXECUTIVE AND TEST PROGRAMS METHODOLOGY AND IMPLEMENTATION COMPARISON BETWEEN HP VEE AND LABVIEW", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AUTOTESTCON 1999, IEEE, (19990830), pages 305 - 312, XP002259312 [X] 1-10 * page 307, column 1, paragraph 1 - column 2, paragraph L * * page 305, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 306, column 2, paragraph L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/AUTEST.1999.800395
 [X]  - THOMPSON K D, "COM-based test foundation framework", AUTOTESTCON '99. IEEE SYSTEMS READINESS TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 1999. IEEE SAN ANTONIO, TX, USA 30 AUG.-2 SEPT. 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19990830), ISBN 0-7803-5432-X, pages 19 - 25, XP010356126 [X] 1-10 * figures 1,2 * * page 19, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 21, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 22, column 1, paragraph 1 - column 2, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/AUTEST.1999.800352
 [A]  - FERTITTA K G ET AL, "The role of ACTIVEX and COM in ATE", AUTOTESTCON '99. IEEE SYSTEMS READINESS TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 1999. IEEE SAN ANTONIO, TX, USA 30 AUG.-2 SEPT. 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19990830), ISBN 0-7803-5432-X, pages 35 - 51, XP010356128 [A] 1,7,9,10 * page 35, column 2, paragraph 4 - page 40, column 2, paragraph 8 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/AUTEST.1999.800354
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.