blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1326251

EP1326251 - Computer memory [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.08.2011
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip26.08.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.09.2011  [2011/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US
Former [2003/28]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Erlandson, Erik E.
1443 Long Creek Way
Roseville, CA 95747 / US
02 / Tremblay, David A.
2875 Hillcrest Road
Rocklin, CA 95765 / US
 [2003/28]
Representative(s)Jehan, Robert, et al
Williams Powell
44 Prospect Place
Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/28]Jehan, Robert, et al
Williams Powell Morley House 26-30 Holborn Viaduct
London EC1A 2BP / GB
Application number, filing date02257780.311.11.2002
[2003/28]
Priority number, dateUS2001003210920.12.2001         Original published format: US 32109
[2003/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1326251
Date:09.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/28]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1326251
Date:04.02.2004
[2004/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.12.2003
ClassificationIPC:G11C7/10
[2004/06]
CPC:
G11C7/1021 (EP,US); G11C2207/2281 (EP,US); G11C2207/229 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2003/28]G11C7/10, G11C7/22
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/44]
Former [2003/28]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Computerspeicher[2003/28]
English:Computer memory[2003/28]
French:Mémoire d'ordinateur[2003/28]
Examination procedure19.07.2004Examination requested  [2004/38]
20.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.04.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/39]
12.05.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2011/39]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.11.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
29.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
27.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
27.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
25.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
25.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201009   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5570320  (RUNAS MICHAEL E [US]) [Y] 4,5* column 5, line 42 - column 6, line 30; figures 2,3 *;
 [X]US5966724  (RYAN KEVIN J [US]) [X] 1-5,10 * column 3, line 15 - line 21 * * column 5, line 38 - line 53; figure 1 *;
 [XY]US6108243  (SUZUKI TAKAAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,10 * column 20, line 43 - line 65; figures 15-19 * [Y] 4,5
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.