blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1316873

EP1316873 - System and method for identifying infected program instructions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  21.10.2005
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, California 94304-1185 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Mateev, Nikolay
3 Fox Hill Road
Acton, MA 01720 / US
02 / Desoli, Giuseppe
27 Desmond Street
Watertown, Ma 02472 / US
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Jehan, Robert, et al
Williams Powell
44 Prospect Place
Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]Jehan, Robert, et al
Williams Powell Morley House 26-30 Holborn Viaduct
London EC1A 2BP / GB
Application number, filing date02257807.411.11.2002
[2003/23]
Priority number, dateUS2001099745429.11.2001         Original published format: US 997454
[2003/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1316873
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1316873
Date:22.12.2004
[2004/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.2004
ClassificationIPC:G06F1/00
[2003/23]
CPC:
G06F21/566 (EP,US); G06F21/53 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2005/49]
Former [2003/23]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Identifizieren von infizierten Programmbefehlen[2003/23]
English:System and method for identifying infected program instructions[2003/23]
French:Système et procédé d'identification des instructions de programme infectées[2003/23]
Examination procedure20.06.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.06.2005Examination requested  [2005/33]
07.07.2005Application withdrawn by applicant  [2005/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US5999723  (NACHENBERG CAREY S [US]) [X] 1-10 * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 8 * * column 6, line 5 - line 12 * * column 6, line 53 - line 65 * * claim 1 *;
 [X]US6195587  (HRUSKA JAN [GB], et al) [X] 1,4-10 * column 1, line 50 - column 3, line 3 * * column 3 - column 4, line 54 *;
 [A]WO0169356  (SYMANTEC CORP [US]) [A] * page 12, line 374 - page 16, line 510 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.