EP1318609 - Decoding method and communication device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/24] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Denno, Satoshi, c/o NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2003/24] | Representative(s) | Rees, Alexander Ellison, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street London WC1G 8ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/24] | Rees, Alexander Ellison, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 02257818.1 | 12.11.2002 | [2003/24] | Priority number, date | JP20010347999 | 13.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001347999 | [2003/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1318609 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1318609 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/204, H04L25/03 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
H03M13/39 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/24] | H03M13/39 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2005/22] |
Former [2003/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dekodierungsverfahren und Kommunikationsvorrichtung | [2003/24] | English: | Decoding method and communication device | [2003/24] | French: | Méthode de décodage et dispositif de communication | [2003/24] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/24] | 14.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/22] | 02.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP1189303 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [PX] 1,9 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0051] *; | [PX]EP1220463 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [PX] 1,2,9,10 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0035] *; | [X] - NISHIMURA T ET AL, "SPACE DOMAIN MULTISTAGE INTERFERENCE CANCELER FOR SDMA", VTC 2000-SPRING. 2000 IEEE 51ST. VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. TOKYO, JAPAN, MAY 15-18, 2000, IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLGY CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20000515), VOL. 1 OF 3. CONF. 51, ISBN 0-7803-5719-1, pages 655 - 659, XP000970702 [X] 1,2,9,10 * Sections II A and B * | [X] - BJERKE B A ET AL, "Multiple transmit and receive antenna diversity techniques for wireless communications", IEEE ADAPTIVE SYSTEMS FOR SIGNAL PROCESSING, COMMUNICATIONS, AND CONTROL SYMPOSIUM 2000. AS-SPCC, (20001001), pages 70 - 75, XP010521615 [X] 1,2,9,10 * Section III * | [A] - TSUTOMU SAKAI ET AL, "SOFT-DECISION VITERBI DECODING WITH DIVERSITY COMBINING FOR MULTI-BEAM MOBILE SATELLITE COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19950201), vol. 13, no. 2, ISSN 0733-8716, pages 285 - 290, XP000489292 [A] 1-16 * Section II-B * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.345872 |