EP1314987 - Serial data cursor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. 14200 S.W. Karl Braun Drive, P.O. Box 500 Beaverton, OR 97077-0001 / US | [2007/42] |
Former [2003/22] | For all designated states Tektronix, Inc. 14200 S.W. Karl Braun Drive, P.O. Box 500 Beaverton, OR 97077-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Azinger, Frederick A. 9613 NW Skyview Drive Portland, Oregon 97231 / US | [2003/22] | Representative(s) | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02257905.6 | 15.11.2002 | [2003/22] | Priority number, date | US20010992053 | 21.11.2001 Original published format: US 992053 | [2003/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1314987 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1314987 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01R13/30, G01R13/34, G09G5/08 | [2003/22] | CPC: |
G01R13/30 (EP,US);
G01R13/345 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/08] |
Former [2003/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Serieller Datenzeiger | [2003/22] | English: | Serial data cursor | [2003/22] | French: | Curseur de données en série | [2003/22] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/02] | 21.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4991581 (ANDRIES FRANCIS M [US]) [A] 1-8* column 8, line 8 - column 8, line 23; claim 1 * |