blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1316883 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1316883



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 113
14.08.2008 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
31.10.2006 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
14.07.2006 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
29.05.2006 Invitation to pay examination fee/designation fees with additional fee Search / examination 1
03.01.2006 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
24.10.2005 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
06.09.2005 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.09.2005 European search report Search / examination 2
14.06.2004 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
24.04.2003 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
22.04.2003 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
06.03.2003 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
03.03.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
26.02.2003 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
20.11.2002 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.11.2002 Claims Search / examination 2
20.11.2002 Description Search / examination 29
20.11.2002 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.11.2002 Drawings Search / examination 7
20.11.2002 Priority document Search / examination 49
20.11.2002 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7