blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1316883


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.08.2008 Change - applicant published on  17.09.2008  [2008/38]
03.11.2006 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  06.12.2006  [2006/49]
08.07.2006 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
26.05.2006 Definitive list of designations published on  28.06.2006  [2006/26]
20.05.2006 New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit
20.05.2006 New entry: Period of grace R.85b EPC 1973: despatch of communication + time limit
29.12.2005 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
02.09.2005 Publication of search report published on  19.10.2005  [2005/42]
03.12.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.05.2003 Change - inventor published on  18.06.2003  [2003/25]
18.04.2003 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  04.06.2003  [2003/23]