blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1316883
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2003196108Global Dossier 11.07.2003A
Priority number Date
US99716301 29.11.2001
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1316883Global Dossier 19.10.2005A3
EP1316883 04.06.2003A2
Priority number Date
US99716301 29.11.2001
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US2003101439 29.05.2003A1
Priority number Date
US99716301 29.11.2001