Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1316883

EP1316883 - System and method for executing program code [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.11.2006
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Desoli, Giuseppe
Via Aquileia 9/11
Como 22100 / IT
02 / Bala, Vasanth
64 Hunt Road
Sudbury, MA 01776 / US
03 / Duesterwald, Evelyn
119 College Avenue, Apt 34
Somerville, MA 02144 / US
 [2003/25]
Former [2003/23]01 / Desoli, Giuseppe
27 Desmond Street
Watertown, MA 02472 / US
02 / Bala, Vasanth
64 Hunt Road
Sudbury, MA 01776 / US
03 / Duesterwald, Evelyn
119 College Avenue, Apt 34
Somerville, MA 02144 / US
Representative(s)Jehan, Robert , et al
Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings
London, WC1V 7QH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]Jehan, Robert , et al
Williams Powell Morley House 26-30 Holborn Viaduct
London EC1A 2BP / GB
Application number, filing date02257990.820.11.2002
[2003/23]
Priority number, dateUS2001099716329.11.2001         Original published format: US 997163
[2003/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1316883
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1316883
Date:19.10.2005
[2005/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.09.2005
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/455, G06F9/45
[2003/23]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2006/26]
Former [2003/23]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren zur Ausführung von Programmkodes[2003/23]
English:System and method for executing program code[2003/23]
French:Système et méthode d'exécution de code logiciel[2003/23]
Examination procedure31.05.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/49]
14.07.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
29.05.2006DE   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2006FR   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2006GB   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
29.05.2006M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200504   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[E]EP1316882  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [E] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [XY]  ZHENG C ET AL, "PA-RISC TO IA-64: TRANSPARENT EXECUTION, NO RECOMPILATION", COMPUTER, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, LONG BEACH., CA, US, US, (200003), vol. 33, no. 3, ISSN 0018-9162, pages 47 - 52, XP001075149 [X] 1-8,10 * page 50, column R, line 20 - line 37; figures 1,2 * [Y] 9

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/2.825695
 [Y]  SILBERMAN G M ET AL, "AN ARCHITECTURAL FRAMEWORK FOR MIGRATION FROM CISC TO HIGHER PERFORMANCE PLATFORMS", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SUPERCOMPUTING, CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, ACM, NEW YORK, US, (19920719), pages 198 - 215, XP000576925 [Y] 9 * abstract * * page 201, column L, line 6 - line 11 *