Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1321899

EP1321899 - Method and apparatus for enhancing the contrast of a medical diagnostic image acquired using collimation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.12.2009
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.12.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.01.2010  [2010/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GE Medical Systems Global Technology Company LLC
3000 North Grandview Boulevard Waukesha
Wisconsin 53188 / US
[2009/06]
Former [2003/26]For all designated states
GE Medical Systems Global Technology Company LLC
3000 North Grandview Boulevard
Waukesha, Wisconsin 53188 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Anderton, Larry R.
2782 West 6870 South
West Jordan, Utah 84084 / US
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)Pedder, James Cuthbert
London Patent Operation
General Electric International, Inc.
15 John Adam Street
London WC2N 6LU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/26]Pedder, James Cuthbert
GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street
London WC2R 3AA / GB
Application number, filing date02258040.121.11.2002
[2003/26]
Priority number, dateUS2001099105021.11.2001         Original published format: US 991050
[2003/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1321899
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1321899
Date:26.07.2006
[2006/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1321899
Date:04.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.06.2006
ClassificationInternational:G06T5/40
[2003/26]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT,   NL [2007/14]
Former [2003/26]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Kontrastverbesserung eines durch Kollimation erfassten Diagnostikbildes[2003/26]
English:Method and apparatus for enhancing the contrast of a medical diagnostic image acquired using collimation[2003/26]
French:Appareil et procédé poul l'amélioration du contraste dans des images de diagnostique acquises par collimation[2003/26]
Examination procedure26.01.2007Examination requested  [2007/10]
26.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.07.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.11.2008Fee for grant paid
17.11.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
01.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US5901240  (LUO JIEBO [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 9 *;
 [A]EP0548527  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 3, line 12 - line 15 *