Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1316853

EP1316853 - Bias transfer roll [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.11.2008
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.11.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.12.2008  [2008/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester
New York 14644 / US
[2008/02]
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South
Rochester, New York 14644 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Swift, Joseph A.
5629 Lincoln Road
Ontario, New York 14519 / US
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Skone James, Robert Edmund , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/20]Skone James, Robert Edmund , et al
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2003/23]Rackham, Stephen Neil
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date02258047.621.11.2002
[2003/23]
Priority number, dateUS2001099717830.11.2001         Original published format: US 997178
[2003/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1316853
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1316853
Date:12.05.2004
[2004/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1316853
Date:09.01.2008
Language:EN
[2008/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.03.2004
ClassificationInternational:G03G15/16, G03G21/00
[2004/20]
Former International [2003/23]G03G15/16
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/05]
Former [2003/23]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Polarisierte Übertragungswalze[2003/23]
English:Bias transfer roll[2003/23]
French:Rouleau de transfert polarisé[2003/23]
Examination procedure12.11.2004Examination requested  [2005/02]
27.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.07.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.11.2007Fee for grant paid
23.11.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.10.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US4379630  (SUZUKI YOSHIRO [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,6 * column 4 - column 10; figures 1-9 *