EP1316756 - Gas heater [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RINNAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-ban, 26-gou, Fukuzumi-cho, Nakagawa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [2009/03] |
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states Rinnai Kabushiki Kaisha 2-ban, 26-gou, Fukuzumi-cho, Nakagawa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sobue Tsutomu c/o Rinnai Kabushiki Kaisha 2-ban, 26-gou Fukuzumi-cho Nakagawa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Yano Koji c/o Rinnai Kabushiki Kaisha 2-ban, 26-gou Fukuzumi-cho Nakagawa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Yamada Yutaka c/o Tokyo Gas Kabushiki Kaisha 1-5-20 Kaigan Minato-Ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/40] |
Former [2008/32] | 01 /
Sobue Tsutomu c/o Rinnai Kabushiki Kaisha 2-ban, 26-gou Fukuzumi-cho Nakagawa-ki Nagoya-chi Aichi-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Yano Koji c/o Rinnai Kabushiki Kaisha 2-ban, 26-gou Fukuzumi-cho Nakagawa-ki Nagoya-chi Aichi-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Yamada Yutaka c/o Tokyo Gas Kabushiki Kaisha 1-5-10 Kaigan Minato-Ku Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [2003/23] | 01 /
Sobue Tsutomu c/o Rinnai Kabushiki Kaisha 2-ban, 26-gou Fukuzumi Nakagawa-ki Nagoya-chi Aichi-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Yano Koji c/o Rinnai Kabushiki Kaisha 2-ban, 26-gou Fukuzumi Nakagawa-ki Nagoya-chi Aichi-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Yamada Yutaka c/o Tokyo Gas Kabushiki Kaisha 1-5-10 Kaigan Minato-Ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Fenlon, Christine Lesley, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | Fenlon, Christine Lesley, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02258056.7 | 22.11.2002 | [2003/23] | Priority number, date | JP20010363659 | 29.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001363659 | [2003/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1316756 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1316756 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | [2006/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1316756 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F24C3/04, F24C3/08, F24C3/12, F24C15/10, F24C15/32 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
F24C3/126 (EP,KR);
F23D14/14 (KR);
F24C3/067 (EP,KR);
Y02B40/00 (EP,KR)
|
Former IPC [2003/23] | F24C3/04, F24C3/08, F24C3/12, F24C15/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2006/41] |
Former [2003/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gas-Heizgerät | [2003/23] | English: | Gas heater | [2003/23] | French: | Chauffage de gaz | [2003/23] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/20] | 09.08.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.11.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE, SK, TR | 14.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.09.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3843313 (HELGESON P) [A] 1* columns 1-4; figures 1,6,9 *; | [A]US4083355 (SCHWANK BERND) [A] 1 * columns 3-4; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0601270 (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP]) [A] 1 * columns 1-3; figures 1,2a,2b,2c * |