Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1319852

EP1319852 - Linear motion guide unit with means for keeping cage against wandering [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.07.2012
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.07.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.08.2012  [2012/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Thompson Co., Ltd.
19-19, Takanawa 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]For all designated states
Nippon Thompson Co., Ltd.
19-19, Takanawa 2-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kamimura, Akihiko
392 Tokiwa
Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa-ken 248-0022 / JP
02 / Tsuboi, Takaaki
392 Tokiwa
Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa-ken 248-0022 / JP
03 / Obara, Kouji
392 Tokiwa
Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa-ken 248-0022 / JP
 [2003/25]
Representative(s)Jenkins, Peter David , et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]Jenkins, Peter David , et al
PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
Application number, filing date02258071.622.11.2002
[2003/25]
Priority number, dateJP2001037729211.12.2001         Original published format: JP 2001377292
[2003/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1319852
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1319852
Date:18.10.2006
[2006/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1319852
Date:31.08.2011
Language:EN
[2011/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.09.2006
ClassificationInternational:F16C29/04, F16C35/077
[2006/42]
Former International [2003/25]F16C29/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2007/26]
Former [2003/25]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Linearführungseinheit mit Mitteln zur Verhinderung des Wanderns des Käfigs[2011/20]
English:Linear motion guide unit with means for keeping cage against wandering[2003/25]
French:Dispositif de guidage linéaire avec des moyens pour éviter la déviation de la cage[2003/25]
Former [2003/25]Linearführungseinheit mit Mittel zur Verhinderung des Wanderns des Käfigs
Examination procedure27.11.2006Examination requested  [2007/02]
23.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.07.2011Fee for grant paid
18.07.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.10.2008
Opposition(s)01.06.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
12.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
06.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
18.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
01.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
14.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
06.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[A]DE19815526  (SKF LINEARSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 16 - line 49; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]DE19815525  (SKF LINEARSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 21 - line 51; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]DE4217663  (HYDREL AG [CH]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 50; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]DE7507730U  (FRANKE & HEYDRICH KG) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantDE7507730U
 DE4217663