Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1317912

EP1317912 - An orthotic strut component [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.11.2006
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.12.2006  [2006/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CHAS. A. BLATCHFORD & SONS LIMITED
Lister Road Basingstoke
Hampshire RG22 4AH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/24]For all designated states
CHAS. A. BLATCHFORD & SONS LIMITED
Lister Road
Basingstoke Hampshire RG22 4AH / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Evans, Andrew J. S.
12 Vine Lane
Boundstone, Farnham, Surrey GU10 4DT / GB
02 / Kemp, Martin
Sunnyside Cottage, College Road
Ash, Nr. Aldershot, Hampshire GU12 5AD / GB
 [2003/24]
Representative(s)Blatchford, William Michael , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/24]Blatchford, William Michael , et al
Withers & Rogers Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date02258157.327.11.2002
[2003/24]
Priority number, dateGB2001002939807.12.2001         Original published format: GB 0129398
[2003/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1317912
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61F5/01
[2003/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   IT,   NL,   SE [2004/10]
Former [2003/24]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Orthopädische Stützkomponente[2006/05]
English:An orthotic strut component[2003/24]
French:Elément de tige orthopédique[2003/24]
Former [2003/24]Orthopädische Stützskomponente
Examination procedure08.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/06]
12.12.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
30.03.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SK, TR
31.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/51]
26.07.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
14.01.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004BG   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004CZ   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004EE   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004GB   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004SK   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200504   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US4978358  (BOBYN JOHN D [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US5891071  (STEARNS JEFFREY [US], et al)
 [AD]  R.L. NELHAM, "FIBRE COMPOSITE HIBRIDS MATERIALS". CHAPTER 8., APPLIED SCIENCE PUBLISHERS LTD., XP008015303 [AD] 1,10 * page 261 - page 283 *