Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1316428

EP1316428 - Non-contact communication between device and cartridge containing consumable component [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.03.2007
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 14.01.2009  [2009/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-0811 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/18]For all designated states
SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 160-0811 / JP
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 160-0811 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kosugi, Yasuhiko
c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Sturt, Clifford Mark , et al
Miller Sturt Kenyon
9 John Street
London
WC1N 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]Sturt, Clifford Mark , et al
Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street
London WC1N 2ES / GB
Application number, filing date02258171.427.11.2002
[2003/23]
Priority number, dateJP2001036274528.11.2001         Original published format: JP 2001362745
JP2001036274628.11.2001         Original published format: JP 2001362746
JP2002016474005.06.2002         Original published format: JP 2002164740
[2003/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1316428
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1316428
Date:03.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/175
[2003/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2003/23]
TitleGerman:Drahtlose Verbindung zwischen einem Gerät und einer Tintenpatrone[2003/23]
English:Non-contact communication between device and cartridge containing consumable component[2003/23]
French:Communication sans contact entre un dispositif et une cartouche contenant un composant consommable[2003/23]
Examination procedure17.11.2003Examination requested  [2004/03]
01.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.02.2006Fee for grant paid
20.02.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP06075123.7  / EP1661714
Opposition(s)06.02.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.05.2006
BE03.05.2006
CY03.05.2006
CZ03.05.2006
EE03.05.2006
FI03.05.2006
SK03.05.2006
TR03.05.2006
BG03.08.2006
DK03.08.2006
GR04.08.2006
PT03.10.2006
IE27.11.2006
LU27.11.2006
MC30.11.2006
[2009/03]
Former [2008/37]AT03.05.2006
BE03.05.2006
CZ03.05.2006
EE03.05.2006
FI03.05.2006
SK03.05.2006
TR03.05.2006
BG03.08.2006
DK03.08.2006
GR04.08.2006
PT03.10.2006
IE27.11.2006
LU27.11.2006
MC30.11.2006
Former [2008/31]AT03.05.2006
BE03.05.2006
CZ03.05.2006
EE03.05.2006
FI03.05.2006
SK03.05.2006
BG03.08.2006
DK03.08.2006
GR04.08.2006
PT03.10.2006
IE27.11.2006
MC30.11.2006
Former [2008/28]AT03.05.2006
BE03.05.2006
CZ03.05.2006
EE03.05.2006
FI03.05.2006
SK03.05.2006
DK03.08.2006
GR04.08.2006
PT03.10.2006
IE27.11.2006
MC30.11.2006
Former [2008/21]AT03.05.2006
BE03.05.2006
CZ03.05.2006
FI03.05.2006
SK03.05.2006
DK03.08.2006
GR04.08.2006
PT03.10.2006
IE27.11.2006
MC30.11.2006
Former [2007/50]AT03.05.2006
BE03.05.2006
CZ03.05.2006
FI03.05.2006
SK03.05.2006
DK03.08.2006
PT03.10.2006
IE27.11.2006
MC30.11.2006
Former [2007/48]AT03.05.2006
BE03.05.2006
CZ03.05.2006
FI03.05.2006
IT03.05.2006
SK03.05.2006
DK03.08.2006
PT03.10.2006
IE27.11.2006
MC30.11.2006
Former [2007/38]AT03.05.2006
BE03.05.2006
CZ03.05.2006
FI03.05.2006
IT03.05.2006
SK03.05.2006
DK03.08.2006
PT03.10.2006
MC30.11.2006
Former [2007/13]AT03.05.2006
BE03.05.2006
CZ03.05.2006
FI03.05.2006
SK03.05.2006
DK03.08.2006
PT03.10.2006
Former [2007/12]AT03.05.2006
CZ03.05.2006
FI03.05.2006
SK03.05.2006
DK03.08.2006
PT03.10.2006
Former [2007/11]AT03.05.2006
CZ03.05.2006
FI03.05.2006
SK03.05.2006
DK03.08.2006
Former [2006/52]AT03.05.2006
FI03.05.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2354735  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * page 7, line 9 - page 9, line 17 *;
 [A]DE19954749  (TALLY COMPUTERDRUCKER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9,15-21 * column 4, line 3 - line 56; figure 2 *;
 [A]WO9804414  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-6,15-21 * page 4, line 4 - page 5, line 28; figure 2 *;
 [A]EP1060895  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1-21 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0045]; figure 2 *;
 [A]FR2744391  (IMAJE SA [FR]) [A] 1,15-21 * page 7, column 18 - page 10, column 16; figure . *;
 [A]EP1088668  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1,15-21 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039]; figure 9 *