Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1321931

EP1321931 - Integrated optical unit for use with minature optical discs [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.09.2006
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 19.09.2007  [2007/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STMicroelectronics, Inc.
1310 Electronics Drive Carrollton
Texas 75006-5309 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/45]For all designated states
STMicroelectronics, Inc.
1310 Electronics Drive Carrollton
Texas 75006-5309 / US
Former [2003/26]For all designated states
STMicroelectronics, Inc.
1310 Electronics Drive
Carrollton, Texas 75006-5309 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Chiu, Anthony M.
2563 Buttercup Dr.
Richardson, Texas 75082 / US
02 / Thomas, Danielle A.
16312 Fallbrick Dr.
Dallas, Texas 75248 / US
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)Style, Kelda Camilla Karen , et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London, WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/26]Style, Kelda Camilla Karen , et al
Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
Application number, filing date02258372.804.12.2002
[2003/26]
Priority number, dateUS2001002560118.12.2001         Original published format: US 25601
[2003/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1321931
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1321931
Date:15.10.2003
[2003/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1321931
Date:09.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.08.2003
ClassificationInternational:G11B7/135, G02B6/00, G11B7/12
[2003/42]
Former International [2003/26]G11B7/135, G02B6/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/28]
Former [2003/26]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Integrierte optische Einheit zur Benutztung mit einer miniaturisierten optischen Platte[2003/26]
English:Integrated optical unit for use with minature optical discs[2003/26]
French:Unité optique intégrée à utilisée avec des disques optiques miniaturisés[2003/26]
Examination procedure15.04.2004Examination requested  [2004/25]
26.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.09.2005Fee for grant paid
05.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT09.11.2005
DE10.02.2006
[2007/38]
Former [2006/52]DE10.02.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0143126  (DATAPLAY INC [US]) [X] 1-3,8-10,12-17,19 * page 9 - page 18; figures 8,7,18,26 *;
 [X]WO0003390  (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,8-10,19 * figures 4,6,7 *;
 [X]US6529454  (ASOMA YOSHITO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,8-10,19 * column 9 - column 18; figures 4,6,7 *;
 [A]US5689108  (OHYAMA MINORU [JP]) [A] 1-11,19 * column 2 - column 4; figures 4,5 *;
 [A]US6235141  (FELDMAN MICHAEL R [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 4 - column 7; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]WO9940578  (DIGITAL OPTICS CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * page 6 - page 22; figures 5-7 *