Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1319638

EP1319638 - Permeable cement for wells [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.02.2006
Database last updated on 22.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC.
P.O. Box 1431
Duncan
Oklahoma 73536 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]For all designated states
Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
P.O. Box 1431
Duncan, Oklahoma 73536 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Nguyen, Philip
1107 Jones Avenue
Duncan, Oklahoma 73533 / US
02 / Brown, David L.
Route 1, Box 171
Temple, Oklahoma 73568 / US
03 / Barton, Johnny A.
1002 North 2nd Street
Marlow, Oklahoma 73055 / US
 [2003/25]
Representative(s)Wain, Christopher Paul , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London
WC1V 7LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]Wain, Christopher Paul , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date02258409.805.12.2002
[2003/25]
Priority number, dateUS2001001397511.12.2001         Original published format: US 13975
[2003/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1319638
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:C04B28/04, C04B38/04, C04B24/24, E21B43/08, E21B33/138
[2003/25]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2004/11]
Former [2003/25]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Durchlässiger Zement für Bohrlöcher[2003/25]
English:Permeable cement for wells[2003/25]
French:Ciment perméable pour les puits de forage[2003/25]
Examination procedure28.11.2003Examination requested  [2004/05]
17.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.09.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/14]
03.11.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200504   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US6202751  (CHATTERJI JITEN [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2288557  (VOLLMER LESLIE W) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5363916  (HIMES RONALD E [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *