Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1318275

EP1318275 - Structure for separating the high and low pressure turboexpanders of a gas turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.08.2010
Database last updated on 20.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.08.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.09.2010  [2010/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nuovo Pignone Holding S.P.A.
Via F. Matteucci 2
50127 Firenze / IT
[N/P]
Former [2003/24]For all designated states
Nuovo Pignone Holding S.P.A.
2, Via Felice Matteucci
50127 Florence / IT
Inventor(s)01 / de Meo, Roger
Via F. Baracca, 231/11
50127 Florence / IT
 [2003/24]
Representative(s)Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth , et al
GPO Europe
GE International Inc. The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/43]Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth , et al
Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street
London WC2N 6LU / GB
Former [2003/24]Pedder, James Cuthbert , et al
GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street
London WC2R 3AA / GB
Application number, filing date02258433.806.12.2002
[2003/24]
Priority number, dateIT2001MI0258410.12.2001         Original published format: IT MI20012584
[2003/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1318275
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1318275
Date:08.09.2004
[2004/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1318275
Date:21.10.2009
Language:EN
[2009/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.07.2004
ClassificationInternational:F01D11/00, F02C7/28, F01D25/12, F01D9/06, F01D5/08
[2004/37]
Former International [2003/24]F01D11/00, F02C7/28
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL [2005/21]
Former [2003/24]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Struktur zur Trennung von Hoch- und Niederdruckteil einer Gasturbine[2003/24]
English:Structure for separating the high and low pressure turboexpanders of a gas turbine[2003/24]
French:Structure pour la séparation des sections à haute et basse pression d'une turbine à gaz[2003/24]
Examination procedure08.03.2005Examination requested  [2005/18]
03.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.04.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.08.2009Fee for grant paid
13.08.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.07.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
02.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
05.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]GB623615  (FREDERICK WILLIAM WALTON MORLE, et al) [X] 1-4 * abstract *;
 [A]GB742288  (POWER JETS RES & DEV LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [X]FR965697  (ROLLS ROYCE LTD. UK) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [Y]US4117669  (HELLER JACK A) [Y] 4-10 * column A *;
 [XY]US6179555  (TREMAINE ERIC [CA]) [X] 1-3 * column A; figure 1 * [Y] 4-10