EP1318399 - Passive sample detection to initiate timing of an assay [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LifeScan, Inc. 1000 Gibraltar Drive, Mail Stop 3D Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/24] | For all designated states Lifescan, Inc. 1000 Gibraltar Drive, Mail Stop 3D Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kermani, Mahyar Z. 3154 Gulfstream Street Pleasanton, California 94588 / US | 02 /
Ohara, Timothy 1020 Alicante Drive Danville, California 94526 / US | 03 /
Teodorczyk, Maria 6014 Running Springs Road San Jose, California 95135 / US | [2003/28] |
Former [2003/24] | 01 /
Kermani, Mahyar Z. 3154 Gulfstream Street Pleasanton, California 94588 / US | ||
02 /
Ohara, Timothy 2652 Celaya Circle San Ramon, California 94583 / US | |||
03 /
Teodorczyk, Maria 6014 Running Springs Road San Jose, California 95135 / US | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/24] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02258481.7 | 09.12.2002 | [2003/24] | Priority number, date | US20010013856 | 10.12.2001 Original published format: US 13856 | [2003/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1318399 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1318399 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | [2005/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/487 | [2003/24] | CPC: |
G01N27/3273 (EP,US);
G01N33/487 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/24] | Title | German: | Passive Probefeststellung zum Beginn einer Analyse | [2003/24] | English: | Passive sample detection to initiate timing of an assay | [2003/24] | French: | Détection passive d'un échantillon pour commencer une analyse | [2003/24] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/48] | 15.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/35] | 08.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2154003 (GENETICS INT INC) [A] 9,10 * abstract *; | [X]WO9304371 (PORTON DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [X] 1,5-7,11 * claim 13 *; | [Y]WO0020626 (THERASENSE INC [US]) [Y] 2-4,9 * page 15, line 10 - line 12 *; | [DY]US6193873 (OHARA TIMOTHY J [US], et al) [DY] 2-4,9 * column 2, line 36 - line 54 * * column 5, line 25 - line 60 *; | [A]WO0157238 (LIFESCAN INC [US]) [A] 11 * claims 1,21-25 *; | [A]WO0159425 (I STAT CORP [US], et al) [A] 1* page 13, line 13 - page 14, line 5; figure 1 * |