Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1318038

EP1318038 - Climate control system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.12.2007
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CARRIER CORPORATION
One Carrier Place Farmington
Connecticut 06034-4015 / US
[2006/52]
Former [2003/24]For all designated states
CARRIER CORPORATION
Carrier Parkway P.O. Box 4800
Syracuse New York 13221 / US
Inventor(s)01 / El-Habhab, Hussein
2, Square Prevot de la Moissonniere
76130 Mont Saint Aignan / FR
02 / Stumpf, Andre Georges
15, rue des Belges
76240 Bonsecours / FR
 [2003/24]
Representative(s)Leckey, David Herbert
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Leckey, David Herbert
Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2003/24]Leckey, David H.
Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EV4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date02258511.110.12.2002
[2003/24]
Priority number, dateUS2001001640010.12.2001         Original published format: US 16400
[2003/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1318038
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1318038
Date:14.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:B60H1/32, B60H1/00
[2003/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2003/24]
TitleGerman:Regelungssystem für eine Klimaanlage[2003/24]
English:Climate control system[2003/24]
French:Système de commande de climatisation[2003/24]
Examination procedure25.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/26]
04.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.03.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.09.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
16.11.2006Fee for grant paid
16.11.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.11.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04]
Request for further processing for:16.11.2006Request for further processing filed
16.11.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.11.2006Decision despatched
09.09.2005Request for further processing filed
09.09.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.09.2005Decision despatched
24.09.2004Request for further processing filed
24.09.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.10.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.02.2007
CH14.02.2007
CY14.02.2007
DK14.02.2007
EE14.02.2007
FI14.02.2007
LI14.02.2007
SI14.02.2007
SK14.02.2007
TR14.02.2007
SE14.05.2007
BG15.05.2007
GR15.05.2007
PT16.07.2007
[2009/42]
Former [2009/33]AT14.02.2007
CH14.02.2007
CY14.02.2007
DK14.02.2007
EE14.02.2007
FI14.02.2007
LI14.02.2007
SI14.02.2007
SK14.02.2007
SE14.05.2007
BG15.05.2007
GR15.05.2007
PT16.07.2007
Former [2009/10]AT14.02.2007
CH14.02.2007
DK14.02.2007
EE14.02.2007
FI14.02.2007
LI14.02.2007
SI14.02.2007
SK14.02.2007
SE14.05.2007
BG15.05.2007
GR15.05.2007
PT16.07.2007
Former [2008/21]AT14.02.2007
CH14.02.2007
DK14.02.2007
FI14.02.2007
LI14.02.2007
SI14.02.2007
SK14.02.2007
SE14.05.2007
BG15.05.2007
GR15.05.2007
PT16.07.2007
Former [2007/51]AT14.02.2007
CH14.02.2007
DK14.02.2007
FI14.02.2007
LI14.02.2007
SI14.02.2007
SK14.02.2007
SE14.05.2007
BG15.05.2007
PT16.07.2007
Former [2007/48]AT14.02.2007
CH14.02.2007
DK14.02.2007
FI14.02.2007
LI14.02.2007
SI14.02.2007
SE14.05.2007
BG15.05.2007
PT16.07.2007
Former [2007/46]AT14.02.2007
CH14.02.2007
DK14.02.2007
FI14.02.2007
LI14.02.2007
SI14.02.2007
SE14.05.2007
BG15.05.2007
Former [2007/38]CH14.02.2007
FI14.02.2007
LI14.02.2007
SE14.05.2007
BG15.05.2007
Documents cited:Search[X]US5168713  (HOWLAND LELAND L [US]) [X] 1-15 * column 3, line 20 - column 11, line 29; figures 1,3,4 *;
 [X]US5172559  (RENKEN DAVID J [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10,15 * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 32; figures 1-3 * * column 4, lines 56-62; figure 1 *;
 [X]US5129235  (RENKEN DAVID J [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10 * column 7, line 8 - column 8, line 47; figure 9 *
ExaminationUS3543838