Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1320014

EP1320014 - Method and apparatus for accessing secured electronic data off-line [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.07.2006
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.07.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.08.2006  [2006/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pervasive Security Systems Inc.
535 Middlefield Road, Suite No. 120 Menlo Park
California 94025 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]For all designated states
Pervasive Security Systems Inc.
535 Middlefield Road, Suite No. 120
Menlo Park, California 94025 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lee, Chang-Ping
765 San Antonio Road, Apt. 65
Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US
02 / Garcia, Denis Jacques Paul
696 Towle Way, Apt. 33
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
03 / Hildebrand, Hal c/o Pervasive Security Systems Inc
535 Middlefield Road, Suite 120
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
04 / Vainstein, Klimenty
14840 Olive Avenue, Apt. B
Morgan Hill, CA 95037-9518 / US
 [2003/25]
Representative(s)Käck, Jürgen , et al
Patentanwälte
Kahler Käck Mollekopf
Vorderer Anger 239
86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/12]Käck, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Kahler Käck Mollekopf Vorderer Anger 239
86899 Landsberg / DE
Former [2003/25]Ablett, Graham Keith , et al
Ablett & Stebbing, Caparo House, 101-103 Baker Street
London W1U 6FQ / GB
Application number, filing date02258534.311.12.2002
[2003/25]
Priority number, dateUS20010339634P12.12.2001         Original published format: US 339634 P
US2002007482512.02.2002         Original published format: US 74825
[2003/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1320014
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1320014
Date:01.06.2005
[2005/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.04.2005
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/00
[2003/25]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2006/08]
Former [2003/25]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum netzunabhängigen Zugriff auf elektronische Daten[2003/25]
English:Method and apparatus for accessing secured electronic data off-line[2003/25]
French:Procédé et dispositif permettant d'accéder à des données électroniques hors ligne[2003/25]
Examination procedure02.12.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/34]
03.04.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2006/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
11.01.2006AT   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2006BE   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2006BG   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2006CH   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2006CY   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2006CZ   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2006DE   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2006DK   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2006EE   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2006ES   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2006FI   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2006FR   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2006GB   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2006GR   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2006IE   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2006IT   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2006LU   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2006MC   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2006NL   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2006PT   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2006SE   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2006SK   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2006TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
11.01.2006M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200403   M06   Fee paid on   28.04.2005
31.12.200504   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5892900  (GINTER KARL L [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 56, line 12 - column 58, line 39 * * column 133, line 10 - column 136, line 59 * * column 160, line 35 - column 161, line 35 * * column 168, line 1 - column 170, line 13 * * column 214, line 4 - line 31 * * figures 2,17,35 *;
 [X]EP1130492  (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4,7-10 * column 16, paragraph 69 - paragraph 73 * * column 18, paragraph 87 - paragraph 90 * * column 25, paragraph 142 - paragraph 143 * * column 27, paragraph 169 - column 28, paragraph 170 * * column 47, paragraph 347 * * column 67, paragraph 537 - paragraph 538 * * figures 1,2,5 *;
 [X]WO0184271  (CERTIA INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-10 * page 5, paragraphs 17,18 * * page 6, paragraphs 24,26 * * page 18, paragraph 68 * * page 24, line 3 - line 7 * * page 25, paragraph 84 - page 26, paragraph 86 * * page 29, paragraph 95 - page 33, paragraph 106 *