Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1321904

EP1321904 - Apparatus for sensing optical characteristics of a banknote [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.06.2010
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2019New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Crane Payment Innovations, Inc.
3222 Phoenixville Pike, Suite 200
Malvern, PA 19355 / US
[2016/09]
Former [2015/09]For all designated states
MEI, Inc.
3222 Phoenixville Pike Suite 200
Malvern, PA 19355 / US
Former [2006/33]For all designated states
MEI, Inc.
1301 Wilson Drive
West Chester, PA 19380 / US
Former [2003/26]For all designated states
Mars Incorporated
6885 Elm Street
McLean, Virginia 22101-3883 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Voser, Christian
43 Crets-de-Choully
CH-1242 Satigny / CH
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)Peterreins Schley
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Hermann-Sack-Strasse 3
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/21]Peterreins, Frank , et al
Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8
80807 München / DE
Former [2003/26]Burke, Steven David , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date02258600.213.12.2002
[2003/26]
Priority number, dateEP2001031068020.12.2001         Original published format: EP 01310680
[2003/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1321904
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1321904
Date:14.07.2010
Language:EN
[2010/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.02.2003
ClassificationInternational:G07D7/12
[2003/26]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT [2004/12]
Former [2003/26]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Erfassung von optischen Eigenschaften eines Geldscheins[2003/26]
English:Apparatus for sensing optical characteristics of a banknote[2003/26]
French:Appareil pour détecter des caractéristiques optiques d'un billet de banque[2003/26]
Examination procedure23.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/10]
30.12.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
26.04.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, FR, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, TR
29.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.08.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.12.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.04.2010Fee for grant paid
24.04.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  14.04.2011  29.04.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Giesecke+Devrient Currency Technology GmbH
Prinzregentenstraße 159
81677 München / DE
 [2017/47]
Former [2011/21]
Opponent(s)01  14.04.2011   
GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
D-81677 München / DE
10.06.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.08.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.10.2014Date of oral proceedings
23.12.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.12.2014Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
10.10.2019Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
04.11.2019Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
04.12.2019Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
Appeal following opposition20.01.2015Appeal received No.  T0131/15
23.02.2015Statement of grounds filed
10.10.2019Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
10.10.2019Date of oral proceedings
22.10.2019Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
11.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
02.02.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004BG   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004CZ   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004EE   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004SI   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of ExecutionID:01
For:all designated states
Date:03.11.2006
ID:02
For:all designated states
Date:02.08.2007
[2007/50]
Former [2007/07]ID:01
For:DE ES GB IT
Date:03.11.2006
[2007/50]
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0537513  (URMET SPA [IT]) [X] 1-19 * the whole document * [A] 20-22;
 [XA]EP0718809  (AZKOYEN IND SA [ES]) [X] 1,5,9,14-18,20-22 * abstract * * column 8, line 25 - line 57 * * column 9, line 1 - line 23 * * column 9, line 55 - column 10, line 38 * * figure 1 * [A] 2-4,6-8,10-13,19;
 [A]GB894570  (BRITISH IRON STEEL RESEARCH) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE10005514  (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *
by applicantUS6061121