Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1322101

EP1322101 - Near-end crosstalk noise minimization and power reduction for digital subscriber loops [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.11.2010
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.12.2010  [2010/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STMicroelectronics, Inc.
1310 Electronics Drive Carrollton
Texas 75006-5039 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/26]For all designated states
STMicroelectronics, Inc.
1310 Electronics Drive
Carrollton Texas 75006-5039 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Wang, Xianbin
Suite 106, Rockway Crescent 28
Nepean, Ontario K2G 3S1 / CA
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)Style, Kelda Camilla Karen , et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London, WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/26]Style, Kelda Camilla Karen , et al
Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
Application number, filing date02258608.513.12.2002
[2003/26]
Priority number, dateUS2001002919019.12.2001         Original published format: US 29190
[2003/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1322101
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1322101
Date:05.01.2005
[2005/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.2004
ClassificationInternational:H04M11/06, H04M3/00, H04L27/26
[2005/01]
Former International [2003/26]H04M11/06, H04M3/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2005/38]
Former [2003/26]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Minimierung von nahem Übersprechungsrauschen und Leistungsreduzierung für digitale Teilnehmerleitungen[2003/26]
English:Near-end crosstalk noise minimization and power reduction for digital subscriber loops[2003/26]
French:Minimisation de bruit diaphonique local et réduction de puissance pour des lignes d'abonné numériques[2007/30]
Former [2003/26]Minimisation de bruit diaphonique local et réduction de puissance pour des lignes d'abonné digitales numériques
Examination procedure17.06.2005Examination requested  [2005/33]
16.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/51]
05.08.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2010/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200908   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0161956  (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1-22 * abstract * * page 4, line 26 - page 5, line 1 * * page 6, line 9 - page 7, line 8 * * page 10, line 26 - page 11, line 23 *;
 [A]WO0052894  (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [A] 9,15,21 * abstract *