Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1321475

EP1321475 - Gene useful for diagnosis and treatment of aplasia of corpus callosum and aspermatogensis and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  23.05.2008
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.05.2008Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 25.06.2008  [2008/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MORINAGA MILK INDUSTRY CO., LTD.
33-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2003/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Suzu, Shinya, c/o Morinaga Milk Industry Co., Ltd.
Biochemical Research Laboratory, 1-83, Higashihara
5-chome, Zama-shi, Kanagawa / JP
02 / Hageshita, Hiroaki, c/o Morinaga Milk Industry Co.
Ltd., Biochemical Research Laboratory, 1-83
Higashihara 5-chome, Zama-shi, Kanagawa / JP
03 / Nomaguchi, Kouji, c/o Morinaga Milk Industry Co.
Ltd., Biochemical Research Laboratory, 1-83
Higashihara 5-chome, Zama-shi, Kanagawa / JP
04 / Yamada, Muneo, c/o Morinaga Milk Industry Co.
Ltd., Biochemical Research Laboratory, 1-83
Higashihara 5-chome, Zama-shi, Kanagawa / JP
05 / Hayasawa, Hirotoshi, c/o Morinaga Milk Industry Co
Ltd., Biochemical Research Laboratory, 1-83
Higashihara 5-chome, Zama-shi, Kanagawa / JP
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)Bannerman, David Gardner , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/26]Bannerman, David Gardner , et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date02258645.716.12.2002
[2003/26]
Priority number, dateJP2001038785320.12.2001         Original published format: JP 2001387853
JP2002020945718.07.2002         Original published format: JP 2002209457
[2003/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1321475
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/47, C12N15/12, A61K38/00, C12Q1/68
[2003/26]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/12]
Former [2003/26]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Gen nutzbar für die Diagnose und Behandlung von Aplasia im Corpus Callosum und Aspermatogenese sowie Verwendung desselben[2003/26]
English:Gene useful for diagnosis and treatment of aplasia of corpus callosum and aspermatogensis and use thereof[2003/26]
French:Gène utile pour le diagnostic et le traitement de l'aplasia du corpus callosum et de l'aspermatogenesis et utilisation du même[2003/26]
Examination procedure10.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/26]
19.11.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.01.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2008Application withdrawn by applicant  [2008/26]
23.09.2008Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
15.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
19.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0154474  (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * SEQ ID NOs 247, 667 *;
 [X]WO0155315  (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * SEQ ID NOs 72, 183 *;
 [PX]  DATABASE GENESEQ, Database accession no. ABB10359, URL: EBI, XP002234524 [PX] 1-13 * abstract *
 [X]  DATABASE GENESEQ, Database accession no. AAU18038, URL: EBI, XP002234525 [X] 1-13 * abstract *
 [X]  DATABASE EMBL, Database accession no. BI830026, URL: EBI, XP002234526 [X] 4 * abstract *
 [A]  FECHNER H ET AL, "Expression of Coxsackie adenovirus receptor and alphav-integrin does not correlate with adenovector targeting in vivo indicating anatomical vector barriers.", GENE THERAPY, (1999), vol. 6, no. 9, ISSN 0969-7128, pages 1520 - 1535, XP009006998

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.gt.3301030
 [PX]  SUZU SHINYA ET AL, "Molecular cloning of a novel immunoglobulin superfamily gene preferentially expressed by brain and testis.", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, September 6, 2002, (20020906), vol. 296, no. 5, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 1215 - 1221, XP002234523 [PX] 1-13 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-291X(02)02025-9