Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1321478

EP1321478 - Antibody against Streptococcus mutans and its use in an immunoassay [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  28.10.2005
Database last updated on 20.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2009Change - representativepublished on 24.06.2009  [2009/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tokuyama Dental Corporation
38-9, Taito 1-chome, Taito-ku
Tokyo 110-0016 / JP
For all designated states
Nihon University, School Juridical Person
8-24, Kudan-Minami 4-chome, Chiyoda-Ku
Tokyo 102-8275 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/26]For all designated states
Tokuyama Dental Corporation
38-9, Taito 1-chome, Taito-ku
Tokyo 110-0016 / JP
For all designated states
Nihon University, School Juridical Person
8-24, Kudan-Minami 4-chome, Chiyoda-Ku
Tokyo 102-8275 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ukaji, Fumio, c/o Tokuyama Dental Corporation
38-9, Taito 1-chome, Taito-ku
Tokyo 100-0016 / JP
02 / Hirata, Kouichirou, c/o Tokuyama Dental Corp.
38-9, Taito 1-chome, Taito-ku
Tokyo 100-0016 / JP
03 / Hanyu, Naohiro, c/o Tokuyama Dental Corporation
38-9, Taito 1-chome, Taito-ku
Tokyo 100-0016 / JP
04 / Fukushima, Kazuo, c/o Nihon University
School Juridic. Person, 8-24, Kudan-Minami 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 102-8275 / JP
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)Harding, Charles Thomas , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/26]Harding, Charles Thomas , et al
D Young & Co 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2008/24]Harding, Charles Thomas , et al
D Young & Co 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2003/26]Maschio, Antonio
D Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date02258743.018.12.2002
[2003/26]
Priority number, dateJP2001038459518.12.2001         Original published format: JP 2001384595
[2003/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1321478
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1321478
Date:28.01.2004
[2004/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.12.2003
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/12, A61K39/09, G01N33/558, G01N33/569
[2004/05]
Former International [2003/26]C07K16/12, A61K39/09, G01N33/569, G01N33/577
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [2004/43]
Former [2003/26]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Antikörper gegen Streptococcus mutans und dessen Verwendung in einem Immuntest[2003/26]
English:Antibody against Streptococcus mutans and its use in an immunoassay[2003/26]
French:Anticorps contre Streptococcus mutans et son utilisation dans un essai immunologique[2003/26]
Examination procedure19.07.2004Examination requested  [2004/38]
21.10.2005Application withdrawn by applicant  [2005/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[AD]JPH1036400  ;
 [AD]JP2001172299  ;
 [A]JPH02177898  ;
 [A]JPH02177899  ;
 [AD]  1, vol. 1998, no. 16, Database accession no. 1998-174917, XP002263389 [AD] 1-10 * abstract *
 [AD]  1, vol. 2001, no. 59, Database accession no. 2001-532566, XP002263390 [AD] 1-10 * abstract *
 [A]  1, vol. 1990, no. 33, Database accession no. 1990-252062, XP002263391 [A] 1-10 * abstract *
 [A]  1, vol. 1990, no. 33, Database accession no. 1990-252063, XP002263392 [A] 1-10 * abstract *
 [A]  SHI W ET AL, "Rapid and quantitative detection of Streptococcus mutans with species-specific monoclonal antibodies", HYBRIDOMA, (199808), vol. 17, no. 4, ISSN 0272-457X, pages 365 - 371, XP002119822 [A] 1-10 * abstract * * table 1 *