Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1267475

EP1267475 - Single phase line start permanent magnet synchronous motor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.12.2013
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.01.2014  [2014/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics, Inc.
20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Ku
Seoul / KR
[N/P]
Former [2002/51]For all designated states
LG ELECTRONICS INC.
20, Yoido-Dong, Yongdungpo-Ku
Seoul / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Han, Seung Do
(11/2) 389-15, Ganseok-Dong
Namdong-Gu, Incheon / KR
02 / Shin, Hyoun Jeong
854-7, Mansu3-Dong
Namdong-Gu, Incheon / KR
03 / Cho, Kwan Yeul
Woosung Apt. 107-906, Shingil-Dong
Yongdungpo-Gu, Seoul / KR
04 / Kim, Yoon Hyeo
LG Villige 116-1503, Sungbok-Ri, Suji-eup, Yongin
Gyunggi-Do / KR
 [2002/51]
Representative(s)Cabinet Plasseraud
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2012/36]Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2003/40]Loisel, Bertrand , et al
Cabinet Plasseraud, 84, rue d'Amsterdam
75440 Paris Cédex 09 / FR
Former [2002/51]Fort, Jacques
CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date02290002.102.01.2002
[2002/51]
Priority number, dateKR2001003353914.06.2001         Original published format: KR 2001033539
[2002/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1267475
Date:18.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1267475
Date:02.02.2005
[2005/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.12.2004
ClassificationInternational:H02K21/46
[2002/51]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/42]
Former [2002/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Selbstanlaufender Einphasen-Permanentmagnetmotor[2002/51]
English:Single phase line start permanent magnet synchronous motor[2002/51]
French:Moteur monophasé à aimants permanents à démarrage en ligne[2002/51]
Examination procedure27.07.2005Examination requested  [2005/38]
03.08.2005Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
28.11.2005Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
04.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/03]
11.09.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2014/03]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.01.2006
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
31.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
21.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
26.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
26.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
19.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
24.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
30.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
30.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
09.09.2005AT   M01   Not yet paid
09.09.2005BE   M01   Not yet paid
09.09.2005CH   M01   Not yet paid
09.09.2005CY   M01   Not yet paid
09.09.2005DK   M01   Not yet paid
09.09.2005ES   M01   Not yet paid
09.09.2005FI   M01   Not yet paid
09.09.2005GR   M01   Not yet paid
09.09.2005IE   M01   Not yet paid
09.09.2005IT   M01   Not yet paid
09.09.2005LU   M01   Not yet paid
09.09.2005MC   M01   Not yet paid
09.09.2005NL   M01   Not yet paid
09.09.2005PT   M01   Not yet paid
09.09.2005SE   M01   Not yet paid
09.09.2005TR   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201312   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPH07212996  ;
 [A]DE8031234U  (SIEMENS) [A] 1 * page 1, line 27 - line 34 *;
 [A]JP2001037186  ;
 [A]GB677942  (BRITISH THOMSON HOUSTON CO LTD) [A] 1 * page 5, line 29 - line 40 * * figure 6 *;
 [A]JPS55133654
 [Y]  - CARLSON R ET AL, "Single-phase line-started permanent magnet motor analysis using finite element method", INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS SOCIETY ANNUAL MEETING, 1994., CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE 1994 IEEE DENVER, CO, USA 2-6 OCT. 1994, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, (19941002), ISBN 0-7803-1993-1, pages 227 - 233, XP010124082 [Y] 1 * figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IAS.1994.377473
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. 11, [Y] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010605), vol. 2000, no. 19, [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810110), vol. 0050, no. 03, Database accession no. (E - 040), [A] 1 * abstract *