Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1241842

EP1241842 - Dichotomic method for determining a path between two nodes of a data network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.06.2008
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.03.2011  [2011/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
54, rue la Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2007/14]For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
54 rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue la Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Marce, Olivier
17, Avenue Nationale
91300 Massy / FR
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Chaffraix, Sylvain , et al
Alcatel Lucent
Intellectual Property & Standards
54 Rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Chaffraix, Sylvain , et al
Compagnie Financière Alcatel Département Propriété Industrielle 30, Avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date02290522.804.03.2002
[2002/38]
Priority number, dateFR2001000353015.03.2001         Original published format: FR 0103530
[2002/38]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1241842
Date:18.09.2002
Language:FR
[2002/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1241842
Date:15.08.2007
Language:FR
[2007/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/56
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/38]
TitleGerman:Dichotomisches Verfahren zur Auswahl eines Weges zwischen zwei Knoten in einem Datennetzwerk[2002/38]
English:Dichotomic method for determining a path between two nodes of a data network[2002/38]
French:Procédé dichotomique pour la détermination d'un chemin entre deux noeuds d'un réseau de données[2002/38]
Examination procedure18.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/20]
23.01.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.06.2007Fee for grant paid
04.06.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.05.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
14.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.08.2007
CY15.08.2007
DK15.08.2007
FI15.08.2007
IE15.08.2007
NL15.08.2007
TR15.08.2007
SE15.11.2007
GR16.11.2007
ES26.11.2007
PT15.01.2008
LU04.03.2008
BE31.03.2008
CH31.03.2008
IT31.03.2008
LI31.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
[2011/13]
Former [2010/37]AT15.08.2007
CY15.08.2007
DK15.08.2007
FI15.08.2007
IE15.08.2007
NL15.08.2007
TR15.08.2007
SE15.11.2007
GR16.11.2007
ES26.11.2007
PT15.01.2008
LU04.03.2008
BE31.03.2008
CH31.03.2008
LI31.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
Former [2010/32]AT15.08.2007
CY15.08.2007
DK15.08.2007
FI15.08.2007
IE15.08.2007
NL15.08.2007
SE15.11.2007
GR16.11.2007
ES26.11.2007
PT15.01.2008
LU04.03.2008
BE31.03.2008
CH31.03.2008
LI31.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
Former [2009/33]AT15.08.2007
CY15.08.2007
DK15.08.2007
FI15.08.2007
IE15.08.2007
NL15.08.2007
SE15.11.2007
GR16.11.2007
ES26.11.2007
PT15.01.2008
BE31.03.2008
CH31.03.2008
LI31.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
Former [2009/12]AT15.08.2007
DK15.08.2007
FI15.08.2007
IE15.08.2007
NL15.08.2007
SE15.11.2007
GR16.11.2007
ES26.11.2007
PT15.01.2008
BE31.03.2008
CH31.03.2008
LI31.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
Former [2008/46]AT15.08.2007
DK15.08.2007
FI15.08.2007
IE15.08.2007
NL15.08.2007
SE15.11.2007
GR16.11.2007
ES26.11.2007
PT15.01.2008
MC31.03.2008
Former [2008/28]AT15.08.2007
DK15.08.2007
FI15.08.2007
IE15.08.2007
NL15.08.2007
SE15.11.2007
GR16.11.2007
ES26.11.2007
PT15.01.2008
Former [2008/25]AT15.08.2007
DK15.08.2007
FI15.08.2007
IE15.08.2007
NL15.08.2007
GR16.11.2007
ES26.11.2007
PT15.01.2008
Former [2008/23]AT15.08.2007
DK15.08.2007
FI15.08.2007
IE15.08.2007
NL15.08.2007
GR16.11.2007
ES26.11.2007
Former [2008/21]AT15.08.2007
FI15.08.2007
NL15.08.2007
GR16.11.2007
ES26.11.2007
Former [2008/13]AT15.08.2007
FI15.08.2007
NL15.08.2007
ES26.11.2007
Former [2008/10]FI15.08.2007
NL15.08.2007
ES26.11.2007
Former [2008/09]NL15.08.2007
ES26.11.2007
Former [2008/08]ES26.11.2007
Documents cited:Search[A]US5675741  (AGGARWAL AJAY [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 12 * * column 2, line 28 - column 2, line 47 *