Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1240845

EP1240845 - Hair colouring advising device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  07.03.2014
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]For all designated states
L'ORÉAL
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
L'OREAL
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / LePrince, Soazig
4, rue de l'harmonie
75015 Paris / FR
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Tanty, François , et al
Nony
11 rue Saint-Georges
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Tanty, François , et al
Nony & Associés, 3, rue de Penthièvre
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date02290672.118.03.2002
[2002/38]
Priority number, dateFR2001000360216.03.2001         Original published format: FR 0103602
[2002/38]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1240845
Date:18.09.2002
Language:FR
[2002/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1240845
Date:13.08.2008
Language:FR
[2008/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:A45D44/00
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/38]
TitleGerman:Beratungsvorrichtung zur Haarfärbung[2002/38]
English:Hair colouring advising device[2002/38]
French:Dispositif de conseil pour la coloration capillaire[2002/38]
Examination procedure22.03.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
21.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.2008Date of oral proceedings
26.02.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
07.03.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.06.2008Fee for grant paid
30.06.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.05.2009   
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2009/25]
17.06.2009Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.12.2009Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.01.2011Date of oral proceedings
25.02.2011Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
25.02.2011Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
20.11.2013Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2014/15]
Appeal following opposition20.04.2011Appeal received No.  T0927/11
07.07.2011Statement of grounds filed
20.11.2013Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
20.11.2013Date of oral proceedings
29.11.2013Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
14.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
09.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
14.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
14.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.08.2008
CY13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
IE13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
TR13.08.2008
SE13.11.2008
GR14.11.2008
PT13.01.2009
LU18.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
CH31.03.2009
LI31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
[2015/21]
Former [2011/21]AT13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
IE13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
SE13.11.2008
GR14.11.2008
PT13.01.2009
LU18.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
CH31.03.2009
LI31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2010/47]AT13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
IE13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
SE13.11.2008
GR14.11.2008
PT13.01.2009
BE31.03.2009
CH31.03.2009
LI31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2010/10]AT13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
IE13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
SE13.11.2008
PT13.01.2009
BE31.03.2009
CH31.03.2009
LI31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2010/09]AT13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
IE13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
SE13.11.2008
PT13.01.2009
CH31.03.2009
LI31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2010/08]AT13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
IE13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
PT13.01.2009
CH31.03.2009
LI31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2009/47]AT13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
IE13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
PT13.01.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2009/25]AT13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
IE13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
PT13.01.2009
Former [2009/23]AT13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
IE13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
Former [2009/20]AT13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
Former [2009/15]AT13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
Former [2009/12]FI13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
Documents cited:Search[DXA]EP0290327  (SCHWARZKOPF FRANCE [FR], et al) [DX] 1,2,4-7,16,20,34,36-38,58 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 3 * * column 4, line 5 - line 10 * * column 5, line 4 - line 31 * * example 1 * * claims 1,2,6,8,9 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 8,9;
 [DX]WO0015073  (WELLA AG [DE], et al) [DX] 1,2,7,20,34,58 * abstract * * claims 1,2,4-6 *;
 [DX]US4434467  (SCOTT DALE [US]) [DX] 1-3,7,20,22,34,58 * abstract * * claims 1-3 *
by applicantWO0015073
 EP0290327
 US4434467
 US3736064
 WO9744642
 WO9641139
 WO9811410