Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1260448

EP1260448 - Parallelepipedic package comprising hinged flaps as well as blank for such a package [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.03.2006
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 04.07.2007  [2007/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LU France
Bâtiment Saarinen 3, rue Saarinen
94150 Rungis / FR
[N/P]
Former [2005/20]For all designated states
LU France
Bâtiment Saarinen 3, rue Saarinen
94150 Rungis / FR
Former [2005/17]For all designated states
LU France
Z.I. du Bois de l'Epine, Avenue Ambroise Croizat
91130 Ris Orangis / FR
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
Lu France
Z.I. du Bois de l'Epine, Avenue Ambroise Croizat
91130 Ris Orangis / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Kintzig, Olivier
13, rue de la Vistule
75013 Paris / FR
 [2002/48]
Representative(s)Jacquard, Philippe Jean-Luc , et al
Cabinet ORES
36, rue de St Pétersbourg
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]Jacquard, Philippe Jean-Luc , et al
CABINET ORES, 6, Avenue de Messine
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date02291133.306.05.2002
[2002/48]
Priority number, dateFR2001000681823.05.2001         Original published format: FR 0106818
[2002/48]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1260448
Date:27.11.2002
Language:FR
[2002/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1260448
Date:27.04.2005
Language:FR
[2005/17]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP1260448
Date:22.06.2005
[2005/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:B65D5/06
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/48]
TitleGerman:Quaderförmige Verpackung versehen mit angelenkten Klappen sowie Zuschnitt zu deren Herstellung[2004/50]
English:Parallelepipedic package comprising hinged flaps as well as blank for such a package[2002/48]
French:Emballage de forme parallélépipédique comportant des rabats articules, et flan pour sa mise en oeuvre[2002/48]
Former [2002/48]Quaderförmige Verpackung versehen mit angelenkten Klappen sowie Zuschnitt zu derer Herstellung
Examination procedure27.12.2002Examination requested  [2003/10]
09.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.2004Fee for grant paid
17.12.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.01.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.04.2005
GB27.04.2005
IE27.04.2005
TR27.04.2005
CY06.05.2005
LU06.05.2005
MC31.05.2005
DK27.07.2005
SE27.07.2005
PT10.10.2005
[2007/27]
Former [2007/26]AT27.04.2005
GB27.04.2005
IE27.04.2005
TR27.04.2005
CY06.05.2005
LU06.05.2005
DK27.07.2005
SE27.07.2005
PT10.10.2005
Former [2007/20]AT27.04.2005
GB27.04.2005
IE27.04.2005
TR27.04.2005
CY06.05.2005
LU27.06.2005
DK27.07.2005
SE27.07.2005
PT10.10.2005
Former [2007/11]AT27.04.2005
GB27.04.2005
IE27.04.2005
TR27.04.2005
LU27.06.2005
DK27.07.2005
SE27.07.2005
PT10.10.2005
Former [2006/52]AT27.04.2005
GB27.04.2005
IE27.04.2005
TR27.04.2005
DK27.07.2005
SE27.07.2005
PT10.10.2005
Former [2006/23]AT27.04.2005
GB27.04.2005
IE27.04.2005
DK27.07.2005
SE27.07.2005
PT10.10.2005
Former [2006/14]AT27.04.2005
GB27.04.2005
DK27.07.2005
SE27.07.2005
PT10.10.2005
Former [2006/13]AT27.04.2005
GB27.04.2005
DK27.07.2005
SE27.07.2005
Former [2005/50]SE27.07.2005
Documents cited:Search[XY]GB1259981  (METAL BOX CO LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3,6,9,10,13 * page 2, line 95 - line 116; figures 7-12 * [Y] 7,8;
 [X]EP1055606  (VG NICOLAUS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,9,10,13 * column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 9; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]US6216943  (RYAN MICHAEL [US]) [Y] 7,8 * column 2, line 33 - line 45; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]DE7809215U  (WELLPAPPENFABRIK KUNERT) [A] 5,12 * page 8, line 15 - line 31; figures 2,3,6 *;
 [A]US4589246  (WOOD PRENTICE J [US]) [A] 4,11 * figures 1-6 *;
 [A]GB1033661  (AUSTIN PACKAGING LTD) [A] 1 * figures 1-10 *