EP1260992 - Process of manufacturing an electrical composite insulator having an outer layer and at least one optical fibre, compatible with each other [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/48] | Electrical composite insulator having an outer layer and at least one optical fibre, compatible with each other | ||
[2006/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEDIVER, SOCIETE EUROPEENNE D'ISOLATEURS EN VERRE ET COMPOSITE 79, Avenue François Arago F-92017 Nanterre Cédex / FR | [2006/33] |
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states SEDIVER, SOCIETE EUROPEENNE D'ISOLATEURS EN VERRE ET COMPOSITE 79, Avenue François Arago F-92017 Nanterre Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lepley, Damien 27 place du Changil 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | 02 /
Moal, Eric 52, avenue de Thiers 03270 Saint-Yorre / FR | [2002/48] | Representative(s) | Prugneau, Philippe, et al Cabinet Prugneau-Schaub 3 avenue Doyen Louis Weil Le Grenat - EUROPOLE 38000 Grenoble / FR | [2006/16] |
Former [2002/48] | Prugneau, Philippe Cabinet Prugneau - Schaub, 36, rue des Petits Champs 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02291168.9 | 07.05.2002 | [2002/48] | Priority number, date | FR20010006701 | 22.05.2001 Original published format: FR 0106701 | [2002/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1260992 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1260992 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01B17/32 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
G02B6/442 (EP,US);
H01B17/325 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines elektrischen Verbundisolators mit einer Aussenschicht und mindestens einer optischen Faser, die miteinander kompatibel sind | [2006/10] | English: | Process of manufacturing an electrical composite insulator having an outer layer and at least one optical fibre, compatible with each other | [2006/10] | French: | Procédé de fabrication pour un isolateur électrique composite ayant un revêtement extérieur et au moins une fibre optique les deux étant compatibles entre eux | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/48] | Elektrischer Verbundisolator mit einer Aussenschicht und mindestens einer optische Faser, beide sind miteinander kompatible | ||
Former [2002/48] | Electrical composite insulator having an outer layer and at least one optical fibre, compatible with each other | ||
Former [2002/48] | Isolateur électrique composite ayant un revêtement extérieur et au moins une fibre optique compatibles entre eux | Examination procedure | 27.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/31] | 07.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.08.2006 | FI | 16.08.2006 | IE | 16.08.2006 | GR | 17.11.2006 | PT | 16.01.2007 | LU | 07.05.2007 | [2009/38] |
Former [2008/21] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
GR | 17.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | FI | 16.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10162668 ; | [A]DE3815717 (HOECHST CERAM TEC AG [DE]) [A] 1-5* column 5, line 13 - line 61; figures 2-4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10162668 A 19980619 (NGK INSULATORS LTD) [A] 1-5 * abstract * |