Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1361761

EP1361761 - Telecommunications network management system and method for service monitoring [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  10.10.2008
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2009Change - representativepublished on 24.06.2009  [2009/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Compaq Information Technologies Group, L.P.
20555 SH 249
Houston, Texas 77070 / US
[2003/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Collomb, Jean Michel
Les Micocouliers F1-99, Ave Sidi Brahim
06130 Grasse / FR
 [2003/46]
Representative(s)Lloyd, Richard Graham
Hewlett Packard Espanola, SL
Legal Department
Cami de Can Graells, 1-21
08174 Saint Cugat del Vallés
Barcelona / ES
[N/P]
Former [2009/26]Lloyd, Richard Graham
Hewlett Packard CCF IP Section - Legal Department 5, Avenue Raymond Chanas-Eybens
38053 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2003/46]Lloyd, Richard Graham (GB)
Hewlett-Packard France Intellectual Property Section Legal Department Etablissement de Grenoble
38053 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date02291174.710.05.2002
[2003/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1361761
Date:12.11.2003
Language:EN
[2003/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04Q3/00, H04L12/24
[2003/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2004/37]
Former [2004/32](deleted) 
Former [2003/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Telekommunikationsnetzwerkverwaltungssystem und Verfahren zur Dienstüberwachung[2003/46]
English:Telecommunications network management system and method for service monitoring[2003/46]
French:Système de gestion d'un réseau de télécommunication et procédé pour la surveillance de services[2003/46]
Examination procedure12.07.2004Examination requested  [2004/37]
09.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.2008Date of oral proceedings
25.06.2008Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/46]
25.06.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
05.07.2008Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
19.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
30.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
18.06.2004AT   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
18.06.2004BE   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
18.06.2004CH   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
18.06.2004CY   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
18.06.2004DE   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
18.06.2004DK   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
18.06.2004ES   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
18.06.2004FI   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
18.06.2004FR   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
18.06.2004GB   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
18.06.2004GR   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
18.06.2004IE   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
18.06.2004IT   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
18.06.2004LU   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
18.06.2004MC   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
18.06.2004NL   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
18.06.2004PT   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
18.06.2004SE   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
18.06.2004TR   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
18.06.2004M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200403   M06   Fee paid on   28.07.2004
31.05.200807   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2809513  (BULL SA) [A] 1,8 * page 1, line 5 - page 2, column 2 * * page 5, line 13 - page 6, line 21 * * page 7, line 7 - page 8, column 3 * * page 19, line 3 - page 21, line 2 * * claims 1,2 *;
 [A]WO9842102  (CHRISTMAS M ;FORGET L (CA); CROSSKEYS SYSTEMS CORP (CA)) [A] 1,8 * page 1, lines 16-27 * * page 2, line 35 - page 3, line 7 * * claims 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0810807  (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD) [A] 1,8 * page 4, lines 1-35 * * page 6, line 23 - page 7, line 14 * * page 7, line 56 - page 9, line 37 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]  - M LANGER ET AL, "Customer service management: Towards a Management information base for an IP connectivity service", PROCEEDINGS IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON COMPUTERS AND COMMUNICATIONS, (19990706), pages 149 - 155, XP002162704 [A] 1,8 * the whole document *
 [A]  - J. BEZIVIN ET AL, "THE UNIFIED MODELING LANGUAGE", UML '98: BEYOND THE NOTATION, MULHOUSE, FR, (19980603), pages 200 - 214, XP008007318 [A] 1,8 * the whole document *