Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1260758

EP1260758 - Headlight for motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.11.2003
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.01.2004  [2004/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VALEO VISION
34, rue Saint-André
93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
VALEO VISION
34, rue Saint-André
93012 Bobigny Cédex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Albou, P.
c/o Valeo Vision, 34, rue Saint-André
93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR
02 / l'Hermine, A.
c/o Valeo Vision, 34, rue Saint-André
93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR
03 / Jousset, N.
c/o Valeo Vision, 34, rue Saint-André
93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR
04 / Nouet, R.
c/o Valeo Vision, 34, rue Saint-André
93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR
 [2002/48]
Application number, filing date02291244.817.05.2002
[2002/48]
Priority number, dateFR2001000700925.05.2001         Original published format: FR 0107009
[2002/48]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1260758
Date:27.11.2002
Language:FR
[2002/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:F21V7/00, F21V5/00, F21V14/04, F21V14/06, // F21W101/10
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/40]
Former [2003/33]DE,  ES,  GB,  IT 
Former [2002/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kfz-Scheinwerfer[2002/48]
English:Headlight for motor vehicle[2002/48]
French:Projecteur d'éclairage de véhicule automobile[2002/48]
Examination procedure27.12.2002Examination requested  [2003/10]
04.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/02]
15.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/02]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
02.07.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2003FR   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2003
02.07.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE19526023  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 5 * * column 3, line 31 - line 40 * * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 19 * * column 6, line 32 - column 7, line 28 * * figures 1,6,7 * [A] 7;
 [XA]EP0624753  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,5 * column 1, line 34 - line 45 * * column 2, line 3 - line 46 * * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 51 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 3,8;
 [XA]EP0591566  (AUTOPAL STATNI PODNIK [CS]) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 1 - line 29 * * page 3, line 1 - line 20 * * figures 1,2,4 * [A] 3,5;
 [A]FR2761026  (VALEO VISION [FR]) [A] 1-7 * page 5, line 19 - page 9, line 7 * * figures 1-4 *