Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1265400

EP1265400 - Method and device for controlling data blocks sending [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.05.2005
Database last updated on 23.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel
St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2002/50]For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel
St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Ben Rached, Nidham
32, rue Baron
75017 Paris / FR
02 / Dornstetter, Jean-Louis
6, route de la Grange aux Moines
78460 Choisel / FR
 [2002/50]
Representative(s)Loisel, Bertrand
Cabinet Plasseraud
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR
Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/50]Loisel, Bertrand
Cabinet Plasseraud, 84, rue d'Amsterdam
75440 Paris Cédex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date02291284.427.05.2002
[2002/50]
Priority number, dateFR2001000730605.06.2001         Original published format: FR 0107306
[2002/50]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1265400
Date:11.12.2002
Language:FR
[2002/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1265400
Date:07.07.2004
Language:FR
[2004/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/28, H04L29/06, H04Q7/22
[2002/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/50]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur steuerung der Übertragung von Datenblöcken[2002/50]
English:Method and device for controlling data blocks sending[2002/50]
French:Procédé et dispositif de contrôle d'émission de blocs de données[2002/50]
Examination procedure25.11.2002Examination requested  [2003/04]
29.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.01.2004Fee for grant paid
16.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.04.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.07.2004
FI07.07.2004
IE07.07.2004
IT07.07.2004
NL07.07.2004
TR07.07.2004
DK07.10.2004
GR07.10.2004
SE07.10.2004
ES18.10.2004
PT07.12.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/38]AT07.07.2004
FI07.07.2004
IE07.07.2004
IT07.07.2004
NL07.07.2004
TR07.07.2004
DK07.10.2004
GR07.10.2004
SE07.10.2004
ES18.10.2004
Former [2006/52]AT07.07.2004
FI07.07.2004
IE07.07.2004
NL07.07.2004
TR07.07.2004
DK07.10.2004
GR07.10.2004
SE07.10.2004
ES18.10.2004
Former [2006/47]AT07.07.2004
FI07.07.2004
IE07.07.2004
NL07.07.2004
DK07.10.2004
GR07.10.2004
SE07.10.2004
ES18.10.2004
Former [2005/24]AT07.07.2004
FI07.07.2004
IE07.07.2004
DK07.10.2004
GR07.10.2004
SE07.10.2004
ES18.10.2004
Former [2005/23]AT07.07.2004
FI07.07.2004
DK07.10.2004
GR07.10.2004
SE07.10.2004
ES18.10.2004
Former [2005/22]AT07.07.2004
FI07.07.2004
DK07.10.2004
GR07.10.2004
SE07.10.2004
Former [2005/18]AT07.07.2004
FI07.07.2004
GR07.10.2004
SE07.10.2004
Former [2005/13]AT07.07.2004
FI07.07.2004
SE07.10.2004
Former [2005/11]FI07.07.2004
SE07.10.2004
Former [2005/10]SE07.10.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9916264  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1,9 * abstract * * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 5 * * page 3, line 29 - page 5, line 30 * * page 7, line 6 - line 15 * * page 8, line 9 - page 9, line 2 *
 [A]  MING-HUNG LIN ET AL, "Supporting broadband, mobile, high-speed multimedia services based on TDMA MAC protocol", SYSTEMS, MAN, AND CYBERNETICS, 1999. IEEE SMC '99 CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. 1999 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON TOKYO, JAPAN 12-15 OCT. 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19991012), ISBN 0-7803-5731-0, pages 992 - 997, XP010363378 [A] 1,9 * page 993, column 1, line 7 - line 14 * * page 993, column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 3 * * page 993, column 2, line 38 - page 995, column 1, line 21 * * page 996, column 1, line 31 - page 997, column 1, line 7 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICSMC.1999.814228
 [A]  TAAGHOL P ET AL, "An air interface solution for multi-rate general packet radio service for GSM/DCS", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 1997, IEEE 47TH PHOENIX, AZ, USA 4-7 MAY 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19970504), ISBN 0-7803-3659-3, pages 1263 - 1267, XP010228872 [A] 1,9 * page 1263, column 2, line 5 - line 14 * * page 1264, column 1, line 1 - page 1265, column 1, line 17 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETEC.1997.600534
 [A]  AJIB W ET AL, "Acknowledgment operations in the RLC layer of GPRS", MOBILE MULTIMEDIA COMMUNICATIONS, 1999. (MOMUC '99). 1999 IEEE INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON SAN DIEGO, CA, USA 15-17 NOV. 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19991115), ISBN 0-7803-5904-6, pages 311 - 317, XP010370732 [A] 1,9 * page 311, column 2, line 10 - line 15 * * page 312, column 2, line 37 - page 313, column 1, line 18 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MOMUC.1999.819505