Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1284128

EP1284128 - Anhydrous antiperspirant stick [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  18.06.2010
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.06.2010Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 21.07.2010  [2010/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
[2010/29]
Former [2003/08]For all designated states
L'OREAL
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Lemoine, Cyril
38, rue du Manoir
95380 Puiseux en France / FR
02 / Douin, Véronique
15, rue Descombes
75017 Paris / FR
 [2003/08]
Representative(s)Dossmann, Gérard
Casalonga & Partners
Bayerstrasse 71-73
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/29]Dossmann, Gérard
Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71/73
80335 München / DE
Former [2009/30]Dossmann, Gérard
Bureau D.A. Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73
80335 München / DE
Former [2009/28]Dossmann, Gérard
Bureau Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73
80335 München / DE
Former [2007/12]Bulle, Françoise
Bureau Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73
80335 München / DE
Former [2003/08]Miszputen, Laurent
L'OREAL-DPI 6 rue Bertrand Sincholle
92585 Clichy Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date02291956.702.08.2002
[2003/08]
Priority number, dateFR2001001090317.08.2001         Original published format: FR 0110903
[2003/08]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1284128
Date:19.02.2003
Language:FR
[2003/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1284128
Date:29.03.2006
Language:FR
[2006/13]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1284128
Date:21.07.2010
Language:FR
[2010/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.01.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/02, A61K8/19, A61K8/28, A61K8/39, A61K8/49, A61K8/58, A61K8/81, A61K8/86, A61K8/92, A61Q15/00
[2006/10]
Former International [2003/08]A61K7/38
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2003/08]
TitleGerman:Wasserfreier Antitranspirantstift[2003/08]
English:Anhydrous antiperspirant stick[2003/08]
French:Stick antitranspirant anhydre[2003/08]
Examination procedure19.08.2003Examination requested  [2003/43]
15.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.12.2005Fee for grant paid
27.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.12.2006  09.01.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  29.12.2006  11.01.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Beiersdorf AG Intellectual Property - Patente
Unnastrasse 48
20253 Hamburg / DE
 [2009/33]
Former [2007/07]
Opponent(s)01  22.12.2006  09.01.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien
Patente (VTP)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  29.12.2006  11.01.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Beiersdorf AG Intellectual Property - Patente
Unnastrasse 48
20253 Hamburg / DE
Former [2007/05]
Opponent(s)01  22.12.2006   
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien
Patente (VTP)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
06.02.2007Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.10.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.10.2009Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
20.10.2009Date of oral proceedings
10.11.2009Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
10.11.2009Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.03.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
09.06.2010Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
12.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.03.2006
CY29.03.2006
CZ29.03.2006
EE29.03.2006
FI29.03.2006
IE29.03.2006
NL29.03.2006
SK29.03.2006
TR29.03.2006
BG29.06.2006
DK29.06.2006
SE29.06.2006
GR30.06.2006
LU02.08.2006
PT29.08.2006
BE31.08.2006
CH31.08.2006
LI31.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
IT02.08.2008
ES04.08.2008
[2010/08]
Former [2009/39]AT29.03.2006
CY29.03.2006
CZ29.03.2006
EE29.03.2006
FI29.03.2006
IE29.03.2006
NL29.03.2006
SK29.03.2006
TR29.03.2006
BG29.06.2006
DK29.06.2006
SE29.06.2006
GR30.06.2006
LU02.08.2006
PT29.08.2006
BE31.08.2006
CH31.08.2006
LI31.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
IT02.08.2008
Former [2009/03]AT29.03.2006
CY29.03.2006
CZ29.03.2006
EE29.03.2006
FI29.03.2006
IE29.03.2006
NL29.03.2006
SK29.03.2006
TR29.03.2006
BG29.06.2006
DK29.06.2006
SE29.06.2006
GR30.06.2006
LU02.08.2006
PT29.08.2006
BE31.08.2006
CH31.08.2006
LI31.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
Former [2008/37]AT29.03.2006
CZ29.03.2006
EE29.03.2006
FI29.03.2006
IE29.03.2006
NL29.03.2006
SK29.03.2006
TR29.03.2006
BG29.06.2006
DK29.06.2006
SE29.06.2006
GR30.06.2006
LU02.08.2006
PT29.08.2006
BE31.08.2006
CH31.08.2006
LI31.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
Former [2008/28]AT29.03.2006
CZ29.03.2006
EE29.03.2006
FI29.03.2006
IE29.03.2006
NL29.03.2006
SK29.03.2006
BG29.06.2006
DK29.06.2006
SE29.06.2006
GR30.06.2006
PT29.08.2006
BE31.08.2006
CH31.08.2006
LI31.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
Former [2008/21]AT29.03.2006
CZ29.03.2006
IE29.03.2006
NL29.03.2006
SK29.03.2006
BG29.06.2006
DK29.06.2006
SE29.06.2006
GR30.06.2006
PT29.08.2006
BE31.08.2006
CH31.08.2006
LI31.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
Former [2007/45]AT29.03.2006
IE29.03.2006
NL29.03.2006
SK29.03.2006
BG29.06.2006
DK29.06.2006
SE29.06.2006
PT29.08.2006
BE31.08.2006
CH31.08.2006
LI31.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
Former [2007/38]AT29.03.2006
IE29.03.2006
IT29.03.2006
NL29.03.2006
SK29.03.2006
BG29.06.2006
DK29.06.2006
SE29.06.2006
PT29.08.2006
BE31.08.2006
CH31.08.2006
LI31.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
Former [2007/30]AT29.03.2006
IE29.03.2006
NL29.03.2006
SK29.03.2006
BG29.06.2006
DK29.06.2006
SE29.06.2006
PT29.08.2006
BE31.08.2006
CH31.08.2006
LI31.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
Former [2007/19]AT29.03.2006
IE29.03.2006
NL29.03.2006
SK29.03.2006
BG29.06.2006
DK29.06.2006
SE29.06.2006
PT29.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
Former [2007/12]AT29.03.2006
IE29.03.2006
SK29.03.2006
BG29.06.2006
DK29.06.2006
SE29.06.2006
PT29.08.2006
Former [2007/11]AT29.03.2006
SK29.03.2006
BG29.06.2006
DK29.06.2006
SE29.06.2006
PT29.08.2006
Former [2007/03]AT29.03.2006
SK29.03.2006
BG29.06.2006
SE29.06.2006
Former [2006/48]AT29.03.2006
BG29.06.2006
SE29.06.2006
Former [2006/46]AT29.03.2006
SE29.06.2006
Former [2006/43]AT29.03.2006
Documents cited:Search[Y]US6126928  (SWAILE DAVID FREDERICK [US]) [Y] 1-18 * column 11, line 26 - line 35; example 1; claims 1-34 *;
 [Y]US5376363  (BENFATTO ANTHONY J [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * column 6, line 13 - line 68; claims 1-7 *;
 [Y]WO9530405  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 1-18 * page 1, line 24 - line 37; examples 9,12; claims 1-3 *;
 [DY]US6177066  (PATAUT FRANCOISE [FR], et al) [DY] 1-18 * claims 1-28; table I *;
 [A]GB1549555  (WARNER LAMBERT CO) [A] 1-4 * examples 1,2; claims 1-6 *;
 [A]US5916546  (SAWIN PHILIP ANDREW [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * examples I-IV; claims 1-14 *
by applicantUS6177066
 WO0113871
 WO0107007
 WO0074643
OppositionUS5302381
 US5925339
 US5378452
 GB2076289
 DE3120742
 EP0135315
 US6126928
 GB1549555
 CA1068215
 US4049792
 WO0010521
    - COSMETICS & TOILETRIES, (199004), vol. 105, page 76