Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1298679

EP1298679 - Electropneumatic pilot [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.10.2009
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Asco Joucomatic
32, Avenue Albert 1er
92506 Rueil Malmaison Cédex / FR
[2003/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Derouet, Franck
10 rue du Levant
28300 Challet / FR
02 / Balat, Jean-Marc
5 rue des Fosses Blanches
28600 Luisant / FR
 [2003/14]
Representative(s)Peaucelle, Chantal , et al
Cabinet Armengaud Aîné
3, Avenue Bugeaud
75116 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2004/10]Peaucelle, Chantal , et al
Cabinet ARMENGAUD AINE 3, avenue Bugeaud
75116 Paris / FR
Former [2003/14]Armengaud Ainé, Alain , et al
Cabinet ARMENGAUD AINE 3 Avenue Bugeaud
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date02292342.924.09.2002
[2003/14]
Priority number, dateFR2001001260901.10.2001         Original published format: FR 0112609
[2003/14]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1298679
Date:02.04.2003
Language:FR
[2003/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1298679
Date:10.12.2008
Language:FR
[2008/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.01.2003
ClassificationInternational:H01F7/12
[2003/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2003/14]
TitleGerman:Elektropneumatisches Ventil[2003/14]
English:Electropneumatic pilot[2003/14]
French:Pilote électro-pneumatique[2003/14]
Examination procedure04.09.2003Examination requested  [2003/45]
17.07.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.10.2008Fee for grant paid
25.10.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.09.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
16.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
18.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
09.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT10.12.2008
CY10.12.2008
CZ10.12.2008
DK10.12.2008
EE10.12.2008
FI10.12.2008
IE10.12.2008
NL10.12.2008
SK10.12.2008
TR10.12.2008
BG10.03.2009
SE10.03.2009
GR11.03.2009
ES21.03.2009
PT11.05.2009
[2011/43]
Former [2010/47]AT10.12.2008
CZ10.12.2008
DK10.12.2008
EE10.12.2008
FI10.12.2008
IE10.12.2008
NL10.12.2008
SK10.12.2008
BG10.03.2009
SE10.03.2009
GR11.03.2009
ES21.03.2009
PT11.05.2009
Former [2009/46]AT10.12.2008
CZ10.12.2008
DK10.12.2008
EE10.12.2008
FI10.12.2008
IE10.12.2008
NL10.12.2008
SK10.12.2008
BG10.03.2009
SE10.03.2009
ES21.03.2009
PT11.05.2009
Former [2009/43]AT10.12.2008
CZ10.12.2008
EE10.12.2008
FI10.12.2008
IE10.12.2008
NL10.12.2008
SK10.12.2008
BG10.03.2009
SE10.03.2009
ES21.03.2009
PT11.05.2009
Former [2009/39]AT10.12.2008
CZ10.12.2008
EE10.12.2008
FI10.12.2008
IE10.12.2008
NL10.12.2008
BG10.03.2009
SE10.03.2009
ES21.03.2009
PT11.05.2009
Former [2009/38]EE10.12.2008
FI10.12.2008
IE10.12.2008
NL10.12.2008
BG10.03.2009
SE10.03.2009
ES21.03.2009
PT11.05.2009
Former [2009/36]EE10.12.2008
FI10.12.2008
IE10.12.2008
NL10.12.2008
BG10.03.2009
ES21.03.2009
Former [2009/34]FI10.12.2008
IE10.12.2008
NL10.12.2008
BG10.03.2009
ES21.03.2009
Former [2009/33]FI10.12.2008
NL10.12.2008
ES21.03.2009
Former [2009/25]FI10.12.2008
NL10.12.2008
Documents cited:Search[A]US2410320  (WASSERLEIN HENRY G) [A] 1 * column 1, line 50 - line 52 *;
 [A]US5127625  (KLEINHAPPL ERICH) [A] 1 * column 3, line 46 - line 59 *;
 [A]US4200972  (KATCHKA JAY R ET AL)