Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1298679 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1298679



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 65
04.03.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
14.10.2009 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
13.11.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
25.10.2008 English translation of the claims Search / examination 1
25.10.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
25.10.2008 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
17.07.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
17.07.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
17.07.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
17.07.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 7
21.01.2004 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
14.01.2004 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
08.04.2003 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
19.02.2003 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
05.02.2003 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
02.01.2003 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
02.01.2003 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.01.2003 European search report Search / examination 1
07.11.2002 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 2
07.11.2002 Priority document Search / examination 16
24.09.2002 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.09.2002 Claims Search / examination 1
24.09.2002 Description Search / examination 3
24.09.2002 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
24.09.2002 Drawings Search / examination 3
24.09.2002 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 2
24.09.2002 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7