Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1298679


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
30.09.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.11.2011  [2011/44]
23.09.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.10.2011  [2011/43]
22.10.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.11.2010  [2010/47]
16.10.2009 No opposition filed within time limit published on  18.11.2009  [2009/47]
09.10.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.11.2009  [2009/46]
18.09.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.10.2009  [2009/43]
28.08.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.09.2009  [2009/40]
21.08.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.09.2009  [2009/39]
14.08.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.09.2009  [2009/38]
31.07.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.09.2009  [2009/36]
24.07.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.08.2009  [2009/35]
17.07.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.08.2009  [2009/34]
10.07.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.08.2009  [2009/33]
22.05.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.06.2009  [2009/26]
15.05.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.06.2009  [2009/25]
13.11.2008 (Expected) grant published on  10.12.2008  [2008/50]
11.11.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
11.11.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
01.11.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
01.11.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
04.07.2008 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
19.06.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.06.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.08.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.07.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.09.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.03.2004 Deletion: Fee payment for extension state
03.03.2004 Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state
19.01.2004 Change - representative published on  03.03.2004  [2004/10]
14.11.2003 Definitive list of designations published on  02.01.2004  [2004/01]
19.09.2003 Request for examination filed published on  05.11.2003  [2003/45]
15.02.2003 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  02.04.2003  [2003/14]