EP1298026 - Trailer hitch and means for manoeuvring a carriage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COUTIER INDUSTRIE Route de Metzange F-57100 Thionville / FR | [2003/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Coutier, Charles 17 rue des Châteaux 57570 Cattenom / FR | [2003/14] | Representative(s) | Robert, Jean-Pierre Cabinet Boettcher 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | Robert, Jean-Pierre CABINET BOETTCHER, 22, rue du Général Foy 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02292368.4 | 26.09.2002 | [2003/14] | Priority number, date | FR20010012363 | 26.09.2001 Original published format: FR 0112363 | [2003/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1298026 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1298026 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B62B5/06, B60D1/00, B60D1/145, B60D1/50 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
B62B5/049 (EP);
B60D1/00 (EP);
B60D1/145 (EP);
B60D1/50 (EP);
B62B5/06 (EP);
B62B2205/24 (EP);
B62B5/0404 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/14] | Title | German: | Anhängerdeichsel und Betätigungsvorrichtung für einen Wagen | [2003/14] | English: | Trailer hitch and means for manoeuvring a carriage | [2003/14] | French: | Timon d'attelage et de manoeuvre d'un chariot | [2003/14] | Examination procedure | 22.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/43] | 03.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.08.2010 | CY | 04.08.2010 | CZ | 04.08.2010 | DK | 04.08.2010 | EE | 04.08.2010 | FI | 04.08.2010 | IE | 04.08.2010 | IT | 04.08.2010 | NL | 04.08.2010 | SE | 04.08.2010 | TR | 04.08.2010 | LU | 26.09.2010 | BE | 30.09.2010 | CH | 30.09.2010 | LI | 30.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | BG | 04.11.2010 | GB | 04.11.2010 | GR | 05.11.2010 | ES | 15.11.2010 | PT | 06.12.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.08.2010 | ||
IT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
LU | 26.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GB | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.08.2010 | ||
IT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GB | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.08.2010 | ||
IT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.08.2010 | ||
IT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
NL | 04.08.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2457247 (GALLOIS DUGUET REALISA) [A] 4-7* figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2458247 (FOLLIOT JEAN) [A] 8,9 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4351541 (PROPST ROBERT L, et al) [A] 8,9 * figures 1-7 *; | [A]DE3340344 (ROCKINGER SPEZIAL FAB JOH [DE]) [A] 2,3 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]FR2565542 (MARET BRUNO [FR]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 24 - page 3, line 9; figures 1-4; claims 1-4 *; | [A]US4613146 (SHARP TIMOTHY M [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 5,6 *; | [A]EP0226060 (RIPPELTON NV [NL]) [A] 4-7 * figures 3-5 *; | [A]DE19810378 (ORIS FAHRZEUGTEILE RIEHLE H [DE]) [A] 1 * column 7, lines 48-52; figure 6 * |