Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1303069

EP1303069 - Système pour générer des signaux de brouillage [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2003/16]Procédé et système pour générer des signaux de brouillage
[2005/10]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.10.2006
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thales
173, boulevard Haussmann
75008 Paris / FR
[2003/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Brunet, Daniel, Thales Intellectuel Property
13, av, du Prés. Salvador Allende
94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR
02 / Garreau, Frédéric, Thales Intellectuel Property
13, av, du Prés. Salvador Allende
94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR
 [2003/16]
Representative(s)Dudouit, Isabelle
Marks & Clerk France
Conseils en Propriété Industrielle
Immeuble " Visium "
22, avenue Aristide Briand
94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Dudouit, Isabelle
Marks & Clerk France 31-33 Avenue Aristide Briand
94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR
Former [2003/16]Dudouit, Isabelle
Thales Intelectual Property 13, avenue Président Salvador Allende
94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date02292481.508.10.2002
[2003/16]
Priority number, dateFR2001001297609.10.2001         Original published format: FR 0112976
[2003/16]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1303069
Date:16.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/16]
Type: A9 Corrected patent application 
No.:EP1303069
Date:25.06.2003
[N/P]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1303069
Date:14.12.2005
Language:FR
[2005/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.01.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04K3/00
[2003/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2003/16]
TitleGerman:System für die Erzeugung von Störsignalen[2005/10]
English:Système pour générer des signaux de brouillage[2005/10]
French:System for the generation of jamming signals[2005/10]
Former [2003/16]Verfahren und System für die Erzeugung von Störsignalen
Former [2003/16]Procédé et système pour générer des signaux de brouillage
Former [2003/16]Method and system for the generation of jamming signals
Examination procedure01.10.2003Examination requested  [2003/48]
11.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.08.2005Fee for grant paid
25.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.12.2005
CY14.12.2005
CZ14.12.2005
EE14.12.2005
IE14.12.2005
SK14.12.2005
BG14.03.2006
DK14.03.2006
GR14.03.2006
SE14.03.2006
PT15.05.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/28]AT14.12.2005
CZ14.12.2005
EE14.12.2005
IE14.12.2005
SK14.12.2005
BG14.03.2006
DK14.03.2006
GR14.03.2006
SE14.03.2006
PT15.05.2006
Former [2007/50]AT14.12.2005
CZ14.12.2005
IE14.12.2005
SK14.12.2005
BG14.03.2006
DK14.03.2006
GR14.03.2006
SE14.03.2006
PT15.05.2006
Former [2007/38]AT14.12.2005
CZ14.12.2005
IE14.12.2005
IT14.12.2005
SK14.12.2005
BG14.03.2006
DK14.03.2006
GR14.03.2006
SE14.03.2006
PT15.05.2006
Former [2006/52]AT14.12.2005
CZ14.12.2005
IE14.12.2005
SK14.12.2005
BG14.03.2006
DK14.03.2006
GR14.03.2006
SE14.03.2006
PT15.05.2006
Former [2006/48]AT14.12.2005
CZ14.12.2005
IE14.12.2005
SK14.12.2005
BG14.03.2006
GR14.03.2006
SE14.03.2006
PT15.05.2006
Former [2006/40]AT14.12.2005
CZ14.12.2005
IE14.12.2005
SK14.12.2005
BG14.03.2006
GR14.03.2006
SE14.03.2006
Former [2006/38]AT14.12.2005
CZ14.12.2005
SK14.12.2005
GR14.03.2006
SE14.03.2006
Former [2006/35]AT14.12.2005
CZ14.12.2005
SK14.12.2005
SE14.03.2006
Former [2006/34]AT14.12.2005
SE14.03.2006
Former [2006/27]SE14.03.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2573216  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * page 1, line 1 - line 24 * * page 2, line 16 - line 20 * * page 2, line 33 - line 37 * * page 3, line 35 - page 4, line 5 * * page 5, line 23 - page 6, line 2 *;
 [A]EP0082055  (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [A] 1,5 * page 1, line 1 - line 6 * * page 1, line 22 - page 2, line 18 * * page 5, line 7 - line 18 *;
 [A]FR2589655  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - line 24 * * page 1, line 35 - page 2, line 3 * * page 2, line 13 - line 20 * * page 4, line 22 - page 5, line 11 *