EP1317003 - Packaging with fixing insert for a semiconductor sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.A. 29, Boulevard Romain Rolland 92120 Montrouge / FR | [2003/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prior, Christophe 33, Les Tonnelles 2 38420 Le Versoud / FR | [2003/23] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | Casalonga, Axel BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Paul-Heyse-Strasse 33 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02292822.0 | 13.11.2002 | [2003/23] | Priority number, date | FR20010014739 | 14.11.2001 Original published format: FR 0114739 | [2003/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1317003 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1317003 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0203, H01L27/146 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
H01L27/14618 (EP,US);
H01L24/32 (EP,US);
H01L24/83 (EP,US);
H01L31/0203 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12043, H01L2924/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2003/23] | H01L31/0203 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/09] |
Former [2003/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gehäuse mit Befestigungseinsatz für Halbleitersensor | [2003/23] | English: | Packaging with fixing insert for a semiconductor sensor | [2003/23] | French: | Boîtier semi-conducteur à capteur, muni d'un insert de fixation | [2003/23] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 04.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 29.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 16.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/26] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 16.05.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 16.05.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.06.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.03.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 16.07.2008 | GB | 13.11.2008 | FR | 30.11.2008 | [2011/45] |
Former [2010/01] | IT | 16.07.2008 | |
GB | 13.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | IT | 16.07.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4622580 (LEVINE PETER A [US]) [X] 1,2,12,14 * column 1, line 60 - column 3, line 17 * * column 4, line 28 - column 7, line 30; figures 1-3C,5 *; | [A]EP0313174 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-9,11,12,14 * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 30; figures 1,2,10,28; claim 10 * * column 8, line 49 - column 11, line 56 *; | [A]EP0398575 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]EP0450560 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]US5098630 (OGIU HISAO [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,10-12,14 * column 2, line 61 - column 6, line 26; figures 2,4-8,13-17 *; | [A]US5289002 (TARN TERRY [US]) [A] 1,12-14 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 19; figure 1 * |