Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1321360

EP1321360 - Method and device for mounting a landing gear on an aircraft structure and aircraft comprising such a landing gear [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2007
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AIRBUS France
316, route de Bayonne
31060 Toulouse Cedex 03 / FR
[2003/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Reniau, Grégory
197, rue Gaston Doumergue
31170 Tournefeuille / FR
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)Poulin, Gérard , et al
BREVALEX
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Poulin, Gérard , et al
Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2003/26]Poulin, Gérard , et al
BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date02293106.716.12.2002
[2003/26]
Priority number, dateFR2001001636518.12.2001         Original published format: FR 0116365
[2003/26]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1321360
Date:25.06.2003
Language:FR
[2003/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1321360
Date:12.04.2006
Language:FR
[2006/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.02.2003
ClassificationInternational:B64C25/04, F16C23/10, F16C23/02, B64F5/00
[2003/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2003/26]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Einbau eines Fahrwerkes auf der Struktur eines Luftfahrzeuges und mit einem solchen Fahrwerk ausgestattetes Luftfahrzeug[2003/26]
English:Method and device for mounting a landing gear on an aircraft structure and aircraft comprising such a landing gear[2003/26]
French:Procédé et dispositif de montage d'un train d'atterrisage sur une structure d'aéronef et aéronef comportant un tel train[2003/26]
Examination procedure22.08.2003Examination requested  [2003/43]
11.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.02.2006Fee for grant paid
02.02.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.04.2006
CY12.04.2006
CZ12.04.2006
EE12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
IE12.04.2006
NL12.04.2006
SI12.04.2006
SK12.04.2006
TR12.04.2006
BG12.07.2006
DK12.07.2006
GR13.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
PT12.09.2006
LU16.12.2006
BE31.12.2006
CH31.12.2006
LI31.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
[2009/03]
Former [2008/37]AT12.04.2006
CZ12.04.2006
EE12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
IE12.04.2006
NL12.04.2006
SI12.04.2006
SK12.04.2006
TR12.04.2006
BG12.07.2006
DK12.07.2006
GR13.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
PT12.09.2006
LU16.12.2006
BE31.12.2006
CH31.12.2006
LI31.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2008/31]AT12.04.2006
CZ12.04.2006
EE12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
IE12.04.2006
NL12.04.2006
SI12.04.2006
SK12.04.2006
BG12.07.2006
DK12.07.2006
GR13.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
PT12.09.2006
BE31.12.2006
CH31.12.2006
LI31.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2008/28]AT12.04.2006
CZ12.04.2006
EE12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
IE12.04.2006
NL12.04.2006
SI12.04.2006
SK12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
GR13.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
PT12.09.2006
BE31.12.2006
CH31.12.2006
LI31.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2008/21]AT12.04.2006
CZ12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
IE12.04.2006
NL12.04.2006
SI12.04.2006
SK12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
GR13.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
PT12.09.2006
BE31.12.2006
CH31.12.2006
LI31.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2007/48]AT12.04.2006
CZ12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
IE12.04.2006
NL12.04.2006
SI12.04.2006
SK12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
PT12.09.2006
BE31.12.2006
CH31.12.2006
LI31.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2007/45]AT12.04.2006
CZ12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
IE12.04.2006
NL12.04.2006
SI12.04.2006
SK12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
PT12.09.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2007/38]AT12.04.2006
CZ12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
IE12.04.2006
IT12.04.2006
NL12.04.2006
SI12.04.2006
SK12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
PT12.09.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2007/19]AT12.04.2006
CZ12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
IE12.04.2006
NL12.04.2006
SI12.04.2006
SK12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
PT12.09.2006
Former [2007/12]AT12.04.2006
CZ12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
IE12.04.2006
SI12.04.2006
SK12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
PT12.09.2006
Former [2007/11]AT12.04.2006
CZ12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
SI12.04.2006
SK12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
PT12.09.2006
Former [2006/52]AT12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
SI12.04.2006
ES23.07.2006
Former [2006/50]SI12.04.2006
ES23.07.2006
Former [2006/40]SI12.04.2006
Documents cited:Search[Y]US6129310  (SQUIRES THOMAS J [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * figure 2 * * column 1, line 25 - line 35 *;
 [XY]DE1525178  (SACK GMBH MASCHF) [X] 9-12 * the whole document * [Y] 1-8;
 [X]DE3729102  (ROBOTRON VEB K [DD]) [X] 9-11 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 66 * * figure 1 *;
 [X]JPS56101418  ;
 [A]US6042270  (MEYER JOACHIM [DE]) [A] 9-11 * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 8 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19811110), vol. 005, no. 174, Database accession no. (M - 096), [X] 9-11 * abstract * * figure 4 *
ExaminationEP1050456