Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1236964

EP1236964 - Light firearm simulator and its simulating system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.02.2006
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.02.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.03.2006  [2006/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Genie Audio-Visuel et Applications Professionnelles (Société Anonyme)
Zone Albipôle, Chemin Jean Thomas, B.P. 8
81150 Terssac / FR
[2002/36]
Inventor(s)01 / Cordelier, Roger
Porties
12190 Coubisou / FR
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Cabinet BARRE LAFORGUE & associés
95, rue des Amidonniers
31000 Toulouse / FR
[2002/36]
Application number, filing date02352004.227.02.2002
[2002/36]
Priority number, dateFR2001000275528.02.2001         Original published format: FR 0102755
[2002/36]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1236964
Date:04.09.2002
Language:FR
[2002/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:F41A33/02, F41A33/06
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/36]
TitleGerman:Simulator von leichten Feuerwaffen und sein Simulationssystem[2002/36]
English:Light firearm simulator and its simulating system[2002/36]
French:Simulateur d'arme legere de tir et systeme de simulation de tir[2002/36]
Examination procedure10.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/12]
01.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.09.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/12]
20.10.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
17.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XD]US5842300  (CHESHELSKI BEN [US], et al) [XD] 1-7,16,19,23 * abstract * * column 1, line 40 - line 49 * * column 19, line 48 - line 56 * * column 29, line 55 - column 30, line 9 * * column 33, line 13 - line 57 * * column 34, line 35 - line 62 * * column 36, line 4 - line 17 *;
 [A]US5713150  (EALOVEGA GEORGE D [US]) [A] 1-3 * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 4 *;
 [AD]US4830617  (HANCOX ROGER J [GB], et al) [AD] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 31 - line 42 *;
 [A]US4480999  (WITHERELL JAMES L [US], et al) [A] 7-9,17 * abstract * * column 5, line 37 - column 6, line 27 *;
 [A]WO9814745  (KEHL HERMANN [DE], et al) [A] 13,14 * abstract * * page 5, line 24 - page 6, line 10 *
by applicantUS4380437
 US4830617
 US5842300