EP1300604 - Loop chain structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hara, Yutaka 6-2-12, 6-jo, Suehiro Asahikawa-shi Hokkaido / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | For all designated states Hara, Yutaka 6-2-12, 6-jo, Suehiro Asahikawa-shi, Hokkaido / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/15] | Representative(s) | Morelle, Guy Georges Alain Cabinet Morelle & Bardou S.C. 9 Avenue de l'Europe B.P. 72253 31522 Ramonville Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Morelle, Guy Georges Alain Cabinet Morelle & Bardou S.C. 9 Avenue de l'Europe B.P. 72253 31522 Ramonville Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2003/15] | Morelle, Guy Georges Alain Cabinet Morelle & Bardou 9 Avenue de l'Europe BP 53 31527 Ramonville Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 02352018.2 | 26.09.2002 | [2003/15] | Priority number, date | JP20010308688 | 04.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001308688 | [2003/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1300604 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1300604 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16G13/00, F16G13/18, E01F13/02 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
F16G13/18 (EP,US);
F16G15/04 (KR);
F16G13/00 (EP,US);
F16G15/12 (EP,US);
Y10T403/535 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/15] | F16G13/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/43] |
Former [2003/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Rundgliederkette | [2003/15] | English: | Loop chain structure | [2003/15] | French: | Chaîne à maillons ronds | [2003/15] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 29.07.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | 04.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/33] | 14.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.09.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5959587 ; | [A]JP2001182025 ; | [A]JPH1037143 ; | [Y]DE1086499 (KETTENWERKE SCHLIEPER GES MIT) [Y] 8 * column 1, line 18 - line 37 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US3267203 (THOMAS ROSENBERG) [A] 5 * figures 2,3 * * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 20 *; | [A]DE2438283 (WIDMAIER REINHOLD) [A] 6 * figure 6 * * page 2, line 3 - line 9 *; | [XY]WO9616280 (WINTER UDO [AT], et al) [X] 1,4,6 * the whole document * [Y] 8; | [A]FR2792984 (INTERCONTINENTAL EQUIPEMENT VE [FR]) [A] 2 * figures 1,3 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840728), vol. 008, no. 164, Database accession no. (M - 313), & JP59059587 A 19840405 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KK) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010511), vol. 2000, no. 24, & JP2001182025 A 20010703 (NAKANO TAKAO) [A] 6 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 06, & JP10037143 A 19980210 (RAND:KK) [A] 6 * abstract * |