Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1265393

EP1265393 - Data transmission between master and slave, using orthogonal frequency division multiplexing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  01.10.2004
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2004Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 17.11.2004  [2004/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STMicroelectronics S.A.
29, Boulevard Romain Rolland
92120 Montrouge / FR
[2002/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Mestdagh, Denis J.
2606, Route du Bouloud
38410 Saint Martin d'Uriage / FR
 [2002/50]
Representative(s)de Beaumont, Michel
Cabinet Michel de Beaumont
1, rue Champollion
38000 Grenoble / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/50]de Beaumont, Michel
Cabinet Michel de Beaumont 1, rue Champollion
38000 Grenoble / FR
Application number, filing date02354090.905.06.2002
[2002/50]
Priority number, dateFR2001000739306.06.2001         Original published format: FR 0107393
[2002/50]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1265393
Date:11.12.2002
Language:FR
[2002/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04L5/02, H04L27/26, H04B3/54
[2002/50]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/36]
Former [2002/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Datenübertragung zwischen Haupt- und Nebengeräten mittels OFDM[2002/50]
English:Data transmission between master and slave, using orthogonal frequency division multiplexing[2002/50]
French:Transmission de données en maitre-esclave en multiplexage par division de fréquences orthogonales[2002/50]
Examination procedure19.05.2003Examination requested  [2003/29]
10.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/47]
04.10.2004Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1021012  (IBM [US]) [X] 1,2,4-10 * abstract *;
 [X]WO9534967  (FRANCE TELECOM [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,4-10 * page 3, line 9 - line 19 *;
 [X]GB2332602  (LSI LOGIC CORP [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 6, line 25 - page 7, line 10 * * page 8, line 20 - line 23 * * page 9, line 2 - line 5 * * page 9, line 8 - line 9 * * page 9, line 15 - line 19 * * page 10, line 4 - line 6 * * page 14, line 6 - line 12 *;
 [A]WO9923764  (TELIA AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 7 - line 13 * * page 3, line 1 - line 2 *;
 [A]WO9534149  (AMATI COMMUNICATIONS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 12, line 16 - line 25 *;
 [A]EP1065818  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * column 17, line 13 - line 31 *;
 [A]EP0933897  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 3 * page 5, line 31 - line 54 *