Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1236847

EP1236847 - Winding-unwinding device for cover in particular for pools [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.04.2005
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.04.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.06.2005  [2005/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Grenier, Philippe Jean-Marie
52 Route d'Heyrieux
69720 St Laurent de Mure / FR
For all designated states
Zellvegre, Pascale Marie
7 Rue des Ecoles
25220 Thise / FR
For all designated states
Bernasconi, Frédérique Marie
13 Rue des Champs Fleuris
83980 Le Lavandou / FR
[2002/36]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Palix, Stéphane , et al
Cabinet Laurent & Charras
"Le Contemporain"
50, Chemin de la Bruyère
69574 Dardilly Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]Palix, Stéphane , et al
Cabinet Laurent et Charras 20, rue Louis Chirpaz B.P. 32
69131 Ecully Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date02356043.601.03.2002
[2002/36]
Priority number, dateFR2001000283601.03.2001         Original published format: FR 0102836
[2002/36]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1236847
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:E04H4/10
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/36]
TitleGerman:Auf- und Abwickelvorrichtung für Abdeckplane insbesondere für Schwimmbecken[2002/36]
English:Winding-unwinding device for cover in particular for pools[2002/36]
French:Enrouleur-dérouleur de bâche ou de volet notamment pour piscine[2002/36]
Examination procedure20.12.2002Examination requested  [2003/10]
02.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/24]
14.01.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3142873  (GRANDERATH ROBERT) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [DA]FR2743104  (DEYME SARL [FR]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [DA]DE4109584  (AQUAMARQ AG [CH]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *