Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1316731

EP1316731 - Axial fan and means for reducing noise [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.09.2007
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.09.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.10.2007  [2007/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fläkt Solyvent-Ventec
143 rue de la République
69330 Meyzieu / FR
[2003/23]
Inventor(s)01 / Longet, Claude Marcel Louis
30 rue du Docteur Rebatel
69003 Lyon / FR
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Martin, Didier Roland Valéry
Cabinet Didier Martin
50, chemin des Verrières
69260 Charbonnières-les-Bains / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]Martin, Didier Roland Valéry
Cabinet Didier Martin 50, chemin des Verrières
69260 Charbonnières-les Bains / FR
Application number, filing date02356249.903.12.2002
[2003/23]
Priority number, dateFR2001001568003.12.2001         Original published format: FR 0115680
[2003/23]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1316731
Date:04.06.2003
Language:FR
[2003/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:F04D29/38, F04D29/16, F04D29/66
[2003/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2003/23]
TitleGerman:Axiallüfter und Mittel zur Lärmverminderung[2003/23]
English:Axial fan and means for reducing noise[2003/23]
French:Ventilateur helicoide avec un moyen réducteur de bruit[2003/23]
Examination procedure01.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/05]
05.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.02.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/41]
23.05.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
22.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200403   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2005
Documents cited:Search[XY]GB2050530  (PAPST MOTOREN KG) [X] 1,3,5-10,12 * page 1, line 110 - page 2, line 82; figures 1-23 * [Y] 2,4;
 [Y]GB946794  (COLCHESTER WOODS) [Y] 2 * page 1, line 8 - line 19 * * page 1, line 78 - line 80 *;
 [Y]DE731575  (FORSCH KRAFTFAHRWESEN UND FAHR) [Y] 4 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5564901  (MOORE R DAVID [US]) [X] 1,3,6,7,10,12 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 21 * * column 4, line 17 - line 44; figures 1,5 *;
 [X]WO0164510  (HAN WEI [CN], et al) [X] 1,3,6,7,10,12 * figures 1,3 *;
 [X]EP1070849  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1,3 * column 6, line 43 - column 7, line 4; figures 9,16 *