Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1260249

EP1260249 - Exercise apparatus with pneumatic cylinder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.10.2006
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2007Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT
published on 07.11.2007  [2007/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Multi'Form
Lieudit Grand Pont
13640 La Roque D'Antheron / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
Multi Form
Lieudit Grand Pont
13640 La Roque D'Antheron / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Minguet, Yves
Chemin du Grand Saint Paul
13840 Rognes / FR
02 / Mercier, Stéphane
8 Clos de la Trévaresse
13840 Rognes / FR
 [2002/48]
Representative(s)Domange, Maxime , et al
Cabinet Beau de Lomenie
Tour Méditerranée
65 avenue Jules Cantini
13006 Marseille / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]Domange, Maxime , et al
Cabinet Beau de Lomenie, 232, avenue du Prado
13295 Marseille Cedex 08 / FR
Application number, filing date02358010.315.05.2002
[2002/48]
Priority number, dateFR2001000669221.05.2001         Original published format: FR 0106692
[2002/48]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1260249
Date:27.11.2002
Language:FR
[2002/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1260249
Date:21.12.2005
Language:FR
[2005/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:A63B21/008
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [2003/33]
Former [2002/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Übungsgerät mit Pneumatikzylinder[2002/48]
English:Exercise apparatus with pneumatic cylinder[2002/48]
French:Appareil de gymnastique à vérin pneumatique.[2002/48]
Examination procedure31.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/22]
28.05.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
29.09.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
24.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.10.2005Fee for grant paid
21.10.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
11.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
01.07.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
01.07.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
01.07.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
01.07.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
01.07.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
01.07.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
01.07.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
01.07.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
01.07.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
01.07.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
01.07.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
01.07.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
01.07.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
01.07.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
01.07.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
01.07.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2007/45]
Former [2007/38]IT21.12.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0878216  (KASUGA HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1,4-7 * column 14, line 1 - line 40; figures 6-8 * * column 15, line 11 - column 16, line 17; figure 12 *;
 [A]US4826156  (DREIER BEAT [CH]) [A] 1,4,6 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 36; figures 1-5 * * column 2, line 52 - line 63; figure 7 *;
 [A]FR2686259  (THEROND LEON [FR]) [A] 1,4,7 * page 6, line 1 - page 9, line 28; figures 2-6 *;
 [A]GB2193901  (WILSON SPORTING GOODS) [A] 1,3 * page 1, line 103 - page 2, line 9; figure 1 *
by applicantUS5147263