Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1254844

EP1254844 - Box-pallet [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.10.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.10.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.12.2004  [2004/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rhin Emballages Production Société Anonyme
Zone Industrielle - Rue de l'Expansion
67150 Erstein Gare / FR
[2002/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Wernette, Alain
4, rue des Peupliers
67640 Lipsheim / FR
 [2002/45]
Representative(s)Rhein, Alain
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
4A, rue de l'Industrie
67450 Mundolsheim / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/45]Rhein, Alain
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein 8, Avenue Pierre Mendès France
67300 Schiltigheim / FR
Application number, filing date02360120.612.04.2002
[2002/45]
Priority number, dateFR2001000576227.04.2001         Original published format: FR 0105762
FR2001001092620.08.2001         Original published format: FR 0110926
[2002/45]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1254844
Date:06.11.2002
Language:FR
[2002/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:B65D19/20
[2002/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/45]
TitleGerman:Palletenbehälter[2002/45]
English:Box-pallet[2002/45]
French:Dispositif de caisse-palette[2002/45]
Examination procedure12.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/24]
19.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/49]
02.07.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]US4949898  (NEDERVELD TERRILL L [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [A]US4296860  (HSU FU-TONG, et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0919484  (DELPLANQUE ALAIN [FR]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2744096  (DETOURNAY CLAUDE [FR]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2647085  (LEGRAND CAROLE [FR], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract *