Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1258985

EP1258985 - Broadband differential amplifier with compensating device for high frequency gain loss [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.11.2008
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.12.2008  [2009/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STMicroelectronics S.A.
29, Boulevard Romain Rolland
92120 Montrouge / FR
[2002/47]
Inventor(s)01 / Renous, Claude
2 bis, Rue des violettes
38100 Grenoble / FR
02 / Van-Zanten, Francois
8, All-e de la Roseraie
38240 Meylan / FR
 [2002/47]
Representative(s)Schuffenecker, Thierry
120 Chemin de la Maure
06800 Cagnes sur Mer / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/47]Schuffenecker, Thierry
97, chemin de Cassiopée, Domaine de l'étoile
06610 La Gaude / FR
Application number, filing date02368050.713.05.2002
[2002/47]
Priority number, dateFR2001000629814.05.2001         Original published format: FR 0106298
[2002/47]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1258985
Date:20.11.2002
Language:FR
[2002/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:H03F3/45, H03F3/30
[2002/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/32]
Former [2002/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Breitbanddifferenzverstärker mit einer Vorrichtung zur Kompensation von HF-Verlusten[2002/47]
English:Broadband differential amplifier with compensating device for high frequency gain loss[2002/47]
French:Amplificateur différentiel large bande comportant un dispositif compensant la perte de gain en haute fréquence[2002/47]
Examination procedure19.05.2003Examination requested  [2003/29]
21.05.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
10.09.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
29.01.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.05.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/01]
15.07.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2009/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
29.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
26.06.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200807   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5128630  (MIJUSKOVIC DEJAN [US]) [Y] 1,2 * column 5, line 1 - column 7, line 14; figures 4,5 *;
 [A]US5420539  (FENSCH THIERRY [FR]) [A] 1,3,5 * column 3, line 59 - column 5, line 23; figure 3 *;
 [A]US4529948  (BINGHAM DAVID [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 4 - line 48; figure 2 *
 [Y]  DONGEN VAN R ET AL, "A 1.5 V CLASS AB CMOS BUFFER AMPLIFIER FOR DRIVING LOW-RESISTANCE LOADS", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19951201), vol. 30, no. 12, ISSN 0018-9200, pages 1333 - 1337, XP000557237 [Y] 1,2 * page 1334 - page 1335; figures 4,7 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/4.482159