Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1321371

EP1321371 - Composite bag for molluscs [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.01.2008
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intermas Nets, S.A.
Ronda de Collsabadell 1, Poligono Industrial
08450 Llinars del Vallès, (Barcelona) / ES
[2007/10]
Former [2003/26]For all designated states
Intermas Nets, S.A.
Ronda de Collsabadell 1, Poligono Industrial
08450 Llinars del Vallès, (Barcelona) / ES
Inventor(s)01 / Besas Camps, Luis
Avda. Adolfo Agusti 17
08440 Cardedeu (Barcelona) / ES
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)Curell Aguilà, Marcelino , et al
CURELL SUÑOL S.L.P.
Passeig de Gràcia 65 bis
08008 Barcelona / ES
[N/P]
Former [2003/26]Curell Aguilà, Marcelino , et al
Dr. Ing. M. Curell Sunol I.I. S.L. Agentes de la Propiedad Industrial Passeig de Gracia, 65 bis
E-08008 Barcelona / ES
Application number, filing date02380170.730.07.2002
[2003/26]
Priority number, dateES20010003066U20.12.2001         Original published format: ES 200103066 U
[2003/26]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1321371
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1321371
Date:07.01.2004
[2004/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1321371
Date:07.03.2007
Language:EN
[2007/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.11.2003
ClassificationInternational:B65D30/08
[2003/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2003/26]
Extension statesAL24.04.2004
LT24.04.2004
LV24.04.2004
MK24.04.2004
RO24.04.2004
SI24.04.2004
TitleGerman:Mollusktasche aus Verbundstoff[2003/26]
English:Composite bag for molluscs[2003/26]
French:Sachet de composite pour des mollusques[2003/26]
Examination procedure24.04.2004Examination requested  [2004/26]
13.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.12.2006Fee for grant paid
27.12.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.12.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
09.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.03.2007
CH07.03.2007
CY07.03.2007
CZ07.03.2007
DK07.03.2007
EE07.03.2007
FI07.03.2007
LI07.03.2007
NL07.03.2007
SK07.03.2007
TR07.03.2007
BG07.06.2007
SE07.06.2007
GR08.06.2007
LU30.07.2007
MC31.07.2007
[2009/42]
Former [2009/38]AT07.03.2007
CH07.03.2007
CY07.03.2007
CZ07.03.2007
DK07.03.2007
EE07.03.2007
FI07.03.2007
LI07.03.2007
NL07.03.2007
SK07.03.2007
BG07.06.2007
SE07.06.2007
GR08.06.2007
LU30.07.2007
MC31.07.2007
Former [2009/33]AT07.03.2007
CH07.03.2007
CY07.03.2007
CZ07.03.2007
DK07.03.2007
EE07.03.2007
FI07.03.2007
LI07.03.2007
NL07.03.2007
SK07.03.2007
SE07.06.2007
GR08.06.2007
MC31.07.2007
Former [2009/10]AT07.03.2007
CH07.03.2007
CZ07.03.2007
DK07.03.2007
EE07.03.2007
FI07.03.2007
LI07.03.2007
NL07.03.2007
SK07.03.2007
SE07.06.2007
GR08.06.2007
MC31.07.2007
Former [2008/22]AT07.03.2007
CH07.03.2007
CZ07.03.2007
DK07.03.2007
FI07.03.2007
LI07.03.2007
NL07.03.2007
SK07.03.2007
SE07.06.2007
GR08.06.2007
MC31.07.2007
Former [2008/21]AT07.03.2007
CH07.03.2007
CZ07.03.2007
DK07.03.2007
FI07.03.2007
LI07.03.2007
NL07.03.2007
SK07.03.2007
SE07.06.2007
GR08.06.2007
Former [2008/08]AT07.03.2007
CH07.03.2007
CZ07.03.2007
DK07.03.2007
FI07.03.2007
LI07.03.2007
NL07.03.2007
SK07.03.2007
SE07.06.2007
Former [2008/02]AT07.03.2007
CH07.03.2007
CZ07.03.2007
FI07.03.2007
LI07.03.2007
NL07.03.2007
SK07.03.2007
SE07.06.2007
Former [2007/51]AT07.03.2007
CH07.03.2007
FI07.03.2007
LI07.03.2007
NL07.03.2007
SK07.03.2007
SE07.06.2007
Former [2007/46]AT07.03.2007
CH07.03.2007
FI07.03.2007
LI07.03.2007
NL07.03.2007
SE07.06.2007
Former [2007/40]CH07.03.2007
FI07.03.2007
LI07.03.2007
NL07.03.2007
SE07.06.2007
Former [2007/38]CH07.03.2007
FI07.03.2007
LI07.03.2007
SE07.06.2007
Documents cited:Search[X]GB191413144  (TCHILINGHIRYAN KARABET MARTIN [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-7 * page 1; claim 1 *;
 [X]DE2629026  (HAMMER LIT GMBH) [X] 1-7 * page 6, line 5 - line 14 *;
 [X]US4503559  (WARNKE PATSY L [US]) [X] 1-7 * column 2, line 16 - line 19; claim 1 * * column 2, line 25 - line 27 * * column 2, line 49 - line 50 *;
 [A]EP0802120  (VIANELLO TULLIO [IT]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 9 - line 10 * * column 1, line 22 - line 27 *